Farst v. National Credit Audit Corpoation et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Farst
Defendant: TransUnion LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and National Credit Audit Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv01141
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Roskovensky, Vincent)
September 16, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Ghiasuddin, Mohammad)
September 16, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Ghiasuddin, Mohammad)
September 8, 2022 Filing 19 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Che'lee A. John. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/8/22. (dmn)
September 8, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Che'lee A. John, and Associate counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
September 7, 2022 Filing 18 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Chelee John on behalf of TransUnion LLC Attorney Che'lee A. John is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6052483.. (John, Chelee)
September 6, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion LLC.. (Green, Casey)
September 6, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion LLC.(Green, Casey)
August 18, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Farst. TransUnion LLC served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Marcus, Ari)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by September 16, 2022. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/16/22. (eo)
August 16, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint of Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roskovensky, Vincent)
August 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Roskovensky on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Roskovensky, Vincent)
August 16, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Credit Audit Corporation identifying Corporate Parent First Advantage Corporation for National Credit Audit Corporation.. (Spak, Jason)
August 16, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National Credit Audit Corporation.(Spak, Jason)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. response to the Complaint shall be due on or before September 16, 2022. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/12/22. (dmn)
August 12, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint as to Experian by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marcus, Ari)
August 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Spak on behalf of National Credit Audit Corporation (Spak, Jason)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Farst. National Credit Audit Corporation served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (Marcus, Ari)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Farst. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Marcus, Ari)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Farst. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Marcus, Ari)
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/27/22. (dmn)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (gs)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6010185), filed by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farst v. National Credit Audit Corpoation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Farst
Represented By: Ari H Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: Casey B. Green
Represented By: Chelee John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Vincent M. Roskovensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Mohammad A. Ghiasuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Audit Corporation
Represented By: Jason A. Spak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?