Farst v. Michaels Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Farst
Defendant: Michaels Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01433
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Deal, Kathryn)
October 23, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst Eighth Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
September 20, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst Seventh Notice of Supplement Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
September 20, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst Sixth Notice of Supplement Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
September 20, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst Fifth Notice of Supplement Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
September 14, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Fourth Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Deal, Kathryn)
September 8, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE by Michaels Stores, Inc. of Third Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (Deal, Kathryn)
September 1, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst Third Notice of Supplement Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
September 1, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE Second Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Deal, Kathryn)
September 1, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of First Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Deal, Kathryn)
August 22, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst Plaintiff's Fourth Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
August 16, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Herbal Brands v Photoplaza)(Kanee, Joseph)
August 9, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that defendants motion (Doc. 52) to stay discovery is GRANTED. Discovery in the above-captioned matter is STAYED and all case management deadlines (Doc. 50) are SUSPENDED pending resolution of defendants motion (Doc. 43) to dismiss plaintiffs amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/18/2023 (mw)
July 5, 2023 Filing 57 REPLY BRIEF re #52 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Deal, Kathryn)
June 27, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE by Jennifer Farst of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
June 21, 2023 Filing 55 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #52 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Jennifer Farst.(Kanee, Joseph)
June 9, 2023 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Deal, Kathryn)
June 7, 2023 Filing 53 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #52 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Deal, Kathryn)
June 7, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Deal, Kathryn)
June 7, 2023 Filing 51 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER - SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/7/2023. (mw)
June 7, 2023 Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Fact Discovery due by 3/6/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2024. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/7/2023. (mw)
June 2, 2023 Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN jointly submitted by Jennifer Farst. (Marcus, Ari)
May 26, 2023 Filing 47 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Kanee, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Kanee, Joseph)
May 25, 2023 Filing 46 VERBAL ORDER - It is ORDERED that the motion #45 is GRANTED and movant may file a motion in excess of the word/page limits as requested in the motion. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/25/2023. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
May 25, 2023 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kanee, Joseph)
May 12, 2023 Filing 44 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Declaration of Kody Kaftousian, #2 Exhibit(s) A to Declaration of Kody Kaftousian, #3 Exhibit(s) B to Declaration of Kody Kaftousian)(Deal, Kathryn)
May 12, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction against Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Deal, Kathryn)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2023 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. At least five days before the conference,counsel shall file their joint case management plan with the court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
May 11, 2023 Filing 41 VERBAL ORDER - It is ORDERED that the motion #40 is GRANTED and movant may file a brief in excess of the word and page limits of the Local Rules as requested in the motion. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/11/2023. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
May 10, 2023 Filing 39 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Joseph H. Kanee, Esq. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/10/2023. (mw)
May 10, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
May 9, 2023 Filing 38 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Joseph Kanee on behalf of Jennifer Farst Attorney Joseph Kanee is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6281697.. (Kanee, Joseph)
April 21, 2023 Filing 37 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michaels Stores, Inc. filed by Jennifer Farst. No parties added or terminated.(ma)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss. See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/21/2023 (spm)
April 21, 2023 Filing 35 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Amended Complaint with redline changes)(Marcus, Ari)
April 20, 2023 Filing 34 STIPULATION to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Amended Complaint with redline changes)(Marcus, Ari)
April 20, 2023 Filing 33 VERBAL ORDER - Case Management conference scheduled for today's date is CANCELLED and will be scheduled by further order of the court. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/20/2023. (mw)
April 19, 2023 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Michaels Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Michaels Companies, Inc. for Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Deal, Kathryn)
April 14, 2023 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jennifer Farst. (Marcus, Ari)
April 12, 2023 VERBAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2023 MOVED TO 01:15 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/12/2023. (mw)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs motion (Doc. 19) is GRANTED to the extent plaintiff shall be permitted to file a sur-reply responding to defendants newly raised arguments. Plaintiff shall file the sur-reply authorized by paragraph 1 within 14 days of todays date. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/6/2023 (mw)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Extend Time - Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 4/20/2023 at 11:30 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/16/2023 (mw)
March 16, 2023 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend and Postponement of Rule 16 Conference by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deal, Kathryn)
March 10, 2023 Filing 27 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - on behalf of Michaels Stores Inc.. (Lucido, Anthony)
March 10, 2023 Filing 26 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William Kuzma. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/10/2023. (mw)
March 10, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc #27 was filed in error, defendant to refile with correct document. (ll)
March 9, 2023 Filing 25 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by William Charles Kuzma on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc. Attorney William Kuzma is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6223808.. (Kuzma, William)
March 9, 2023 Filing 24 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kathryn Deal. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/9/2023. (mw)
March 9, 2023 Filing 23 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kathryn E. Deal on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc. Attorney Kathryn Deal is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6223710.. (Deal, Kathryn)
March 9, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 7, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory T. Parks on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc. (Parks, Gregory)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2023 at 02:15 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. At least five days before the conference,counsel shall file their joint case management plan with the court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
February 16, 2023 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Sur-Reply re #19 MOTION to Strike #12 Brief in Support or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Sur-Reply filed by Jennifer Farst.(Marcus, Ari)
February 16, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #12 Brief in Support or in the Alternative, for Leave to Submit Sur-Reply by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Marcus, Ari)
February 16, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 19 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) (pjr)
February 7, 2023 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Lucido, Anthony)
January 23, 2023 Filing 17 VERBAL ORDER - It is ORDERED that the motion #16 is GRANTED and defendant may file a reply in further support of its motion to dismiss no later than February 7, 2023. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/23/2023. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Lucido, Anthony)
January 10, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Declaration of Joseph H. Kanee, Esq., #3 Exhibit(s) A - Michaels Account Creation, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Michaels Create Account SMS, #5 Exhibit(s) C - Account Creation - Base, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Michaels Account Creation TOS - SMS)(Marcus, Ari)
December 14, 2022 Filing 14 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the stipulation #13 is CONSTRUED as a motion for extension of time and is GRANTED as so construed. Plaintiff shall have until January 10, 2023, to respond to the motion to dismiss. The parties are reminded that pursuant to the courts order #2 of September 15, 2022, future requests for extension of time shall be made by motion. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/14/2022. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
December 13, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION to extend deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jennifer Farst. (Marcus, Ari)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2)(Lucido, Anthony)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Lucido, Anthony)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Stipulation filed by Jennifer Farst - Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc., may have an additional extension of time until December 6, 2022, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/23/2022. (mw)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION for additional extension of time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer Farst. (Marcus, Ari)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation filed by Jennifer Farst. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/9/2022. (mw)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION for an additional fourteen (14) days for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer Farst. (Marcus, Ari)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation filed by Jennifer Farst - Defendant MichaelsStores, Inc., may have an extension of time until November 12, 2022, to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/12/2022. (mw)
October 12, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION to extend the deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer Farst. (Marcus, Ari)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Farst. Michaels Stores, Inc. served on 9/21/2022, answer due 10/12/2022. (Marcus, Ari)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michaels Stores, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dw)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/15/2022. (mw)
September 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michaels Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6059398), filed by Jennifer Farst. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farst v. Michaels Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Farst
Represented By: Ari H Marcus
Represented By: Joseph Kanee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michaels Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony T. Lucido
Represented By: Gregory T. Parks
Represented By: Kathryn E. Deal
Represented By: William Charles Kuzma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?