Staats v. DeMatteis et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Staats
Defendant: Delaware Department of Corrections, Claire DeMatteis, Jayme Gravell, Heidi Collier, Kiley Palson, George Little and Warden John Wetzel
Case Number: 1:2022cv01962
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SM
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 17 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Heidi Collier, Claire DeMatteis, Jayme Gravell, George Little, Kiley Palson, John Wetzel Waiver of Service due by 2/24/2023. (ma)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/25/23. (ma)
December 12, 2022 Filing 15 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp)
December 12, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred electronically in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:22-cv-00608 containing electronic documents.
December 8, 2022 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Plaintiff's request for counsel (D.I. #9 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew upon transfer. The case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/7/2022. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
September 8, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
July 12, 2022 Filing 12 Letter to Dwayne Staats, from The Clerks Office, enclosing a copy of D.I. #6 Amended Complaint. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Filing 11 Letter to The Clerk of Court, from Dwayne Staats, requesting a copy of D.I. #6 Amended Complaint. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number DEX037625. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 Letter to Clerk from Dwayne Staats regarding enclosed payment. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Dwayne Staats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED Order to Show Cause - filed by Dwayne Staats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mpb) Modified on 11/4/2022 (smg). [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 DECLARATION in Support of D.I. #6 Amended Complaint by Dwayne Staats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Claire DeMatteis, Jayme Gravell, Heidi Collier, Kiley Palson, George Little, John Wetzel- filed by Dwayne Staats. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mpb) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Dwayne Staats.(Nef Resent with Court Control Number.) (srs) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Remark: D.I. #3 Order, remailed per D.I. #4 letter, with court control number. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 Letter to Office of the Clerk, from Dwayne Staats, regarding returned mail. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit IFP application and a certified copy of his prison trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/10/2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (srs) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
May 11, 2022 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include the initials of the Judge (VAC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se pursuant to 42:1983 against Delaware Department of Corrections - filed by Dwayne Staats.(NO FEE PAID, NO IFP) (srs) [Transferred from Delaware on 12/12/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staats v. DeMatteis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Staats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire DeMatteis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayme Gravell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiley Palson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden John Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?