CHESAPEAKE THERMITE WELDING, LLC v. RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CHESAPEAKE THERMITE WELDING, LLC doing business as CTW
Defendant: RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC. and Tracy L Wingenroth
Case Number: 1:2022cv02004
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that on or before 3/3/2023, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the court whether the parties want the court to schedule a settlement conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may, if it chooses to do so, file an amended complaint on or before 3/6/2023. IT IS ORDERED that any such amended motion to dismiss the original complaint shall be filed on or before 3/20/2023 (see order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on February 8, 2023. (ibr)
February 2, 2023 Filing 20 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Matthew Richard Barnes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on February 2, 2023. (ibr)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew Richard Barnes on behalf of RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth Attorney Matthew Richard Barnes is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6186238.. (Barnes, Matthew)
February 1, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part #16 Motion to Continue. The telephone conference scheduled for February 2, 2023 is changed from a case management conference to a status conference. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on January 20, 2023. (ibr)
January 20, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Continue Civil Case Management Conference by RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hart, P.)
January 19, 2023 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth.(Hart, P.)
January 19, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Schwab in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2022-19. (jkc)
January 19, 2023 Filing 13 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 part two)(aaa)
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Brennan Hart on behalf of RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth (Hart, P.)
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by CHESAPEAKE THERMITE WELDING, LLC.(Lee, Kenneth)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to P. Brennan Hart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on January 3, 2023. (ibr)
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CHESAPEAKE THERMITE WELDING, LLC. (Lee, Kenneth)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by P. Brennan Hart on behalf of RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth Attorney Philip Hart is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6153800.. (Hart, P.)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Earnest, Phillip)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Earnest, Phillip)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to Chambers, see order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on December 22, 2022. (ibr)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip R. Earnest on behalf of All Defendants (Earnest, Phillip)
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 1/18/2023 (ibr)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth. (ll)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth from Dauphin County, Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CV-00219. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-6146855), filed by RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., Tracy L Wingenroth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B)(ll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHESAPEAKE THERMITE WELDING, LLC v. RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHESAPEAKE THERMITE WELDING, LLC doing business as CTW
Represented By: Kenneth W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAILROAD SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Phillip R. Earnest
Represented By: P. Brennan Hart
Represented By: Matthew Richard Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy L Wingenroth
Represented By: Phillip R. Earnest
Represented By: Matthew Richard Barnes
Represented By: P. Brennan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?