Ortiz v. Messinger
Plaintiff: Edward Ortiz
Defendant: Chaplain Messinger and Lewis Messinger
Case Number: 1:2023cv00315
Filed: February 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SM
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
2 Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Rambo. (ktt)
February 23, 2023 Senior Judge Kane has transferred this case and directed that this matter be reassigned. (ktt)
February 22, 2023 Filing 66 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules) (lp)
February 22, 2023 Filing 65 Case transferred electronically in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 5:21-cv-03633 containing electronic documents.
February 17, 2023 Filing 62 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #61 Order on Motion to Dismiss w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: The Court finds that venue is improper in the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #45 , and TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Terry L Wooten on 2/17/2023.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 59 OBJECTION to #55 Report and Recommendation by Edward Ortiz. Reply to Objections due by 1/5/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Response filed by Lewis Messinger. (Holmes, Martin) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
December 15, 2022 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Response filed by Edward Ortiz.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/22/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Edward Ortiz, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Supporting Documents, #4 Envelope)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
December 13, 2022 Filing 56 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC, 29590 (dsto, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
December 13, 2022 Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 12/13/2022. (dsto, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 52 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #51 Roseboro Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC, 29590 (dsto, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Plaintiff is directed to advise the court whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Defendant's Motion (ECF #45 ) by December 8, 2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/08/2022. (dsto, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 50 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 49 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER: On July 25, 2022, Defendant Messinger filed a Motion to Dismiss Complaint. ECF No. #45 . On August 15, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant's Motion. ECF No. #48 . The current deadline for a response is August 26, 2022. Plaintiff seeks an additional sixty days to respond to the Motion, indicating that he has to review and analyze numerous policy and program statements. ECF No. #48 . Plaintiff further states that the institution where he is currently incarcerated is currently under lockdown status, and he is unable to review the necessary documents while the institution is not operating under "normal" circumstances. ECF No. #48 . Plaintiff attached a Memorandum to his Motion to support the claim that FCI Williamsburg was placed in secure status as of August 10, 2022. ECF No. #48 -1. For good cause shown, the court will allow an additional 60 days from the current deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion. Plaintiff's response is now due on or before October 25, 2022. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/16/2022.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. by Edward Ortiz. Response to Motion due by 8/29/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum from R. S. Dunbar, Warden, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
July 26, 2022 Filing 47 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #46 Roseboro Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Response to Motion due by 8/26/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/26/2022. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
July 25, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Lewis Messinger. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Messinger Declaration)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Holmes, Martin) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
June 14, 2022 Filing 44 USM-285 Returned Executed. Lewis Messinger served. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 43 USM-285 Returned Executed. Attorney General of the United States served. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 42 USM-285 Returned Executed. US Attorney served on 3/31/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (prou, ) Modified on 6/14/2022 to edit text (prou, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
March 24, 2022 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Lewis Messinger. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 6/22/2022. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
March 24, 2022 Filing 38 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #37 Order 1983 w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER authorizing service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/24/2022. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
February 14, 2022 Filing 32 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #31 Third Proper Form Order w/NEF and three Summons forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 THIRD PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 3/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/14/2022. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 26 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: 25 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, #24 Second Proper Form Order w/NEF, three Summons, and three USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel per #24 Second Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/24/2022.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 2/14/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/24/2022. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
January 11, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edward Ortiz. Response to Motion due by 1/25/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 15 Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #10 Proper Form Order. Case to be brought into proper form by 2/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/29/2021.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #10 Proper Form Order, by Edward Ortiz. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(dsto, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #10 Proper Form Order w/NEF, 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint, standard complaint form, three Summons forms, and three USM-285 Forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Edward Ortiz, #14506-014, FCI Williamsburg, PO Box 340, Salters, SC 29590. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #10 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/5/2021.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/5/2021. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Edward Ortiz. Response to Motion due by 11/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inquiry, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chaplain Messinger, filed by Edward Ortiz. Service due by 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Letter from Edward Ortiz, #4 Envelope)(prou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #5 Proper Form Complaint, #6 Supporting Documents, #7 Certificates of Service, #8 Envelope) (prou, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/22/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Messinger
Represented By: Martin L Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?