Murray v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: Michelle M Murray
Defendant: Debbie Shaw, Joscelyn Funnie, Lisa Rein, WP Company, LLC, Faith Williams and Project on Government Oversight Business Filings Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2023cv01761
Filed: October 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 2/19/2024. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 12/21/2023 (cw)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the alternative, To Transfer Case by Faith Williams.(Donovan, John)
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Faith Williams. (Donovan, John)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Donovan on behalf of Project on Government Oversight Business Filings Incorporated, Faith Williams (Donovan, John)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Judge, Timothy)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Judge on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Judge, Timothy)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle M Murray. Debbie Shaw served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Murray, Michelle)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle M Murray. Project on Government Oversight Business Filings Incorporated served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Murray, Michelle)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle M Murray. Faith Williams served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Murray, Michelle)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle M Murray. Joscelyn Funnie served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Murray, Michelle)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michelle M Murray. WP Company, LLC waiver sent on 11/5/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. (Murray, Michelle)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michelle M Murray. Lisa Rein waiver sent on 11/5/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. (Murray, Michelle)
October 26, 2023 Receipt of payment from MICHELLE MURRAY in the amount of $402.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 10/25/2023. Receipt number 111101459 processed by SH. (jjs)
October 25, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Joscelyn Funnie, Project on Government Oversight Business Filings Incorporated, Lisa Rein, Debbie Shaw, WP Company, LLC, Faith Williams and provided to Plaintiff via mail.
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 111101459. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (cp)
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (cp)
October 25, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (cp)
October 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joscelyn Funnie, Project on Government Oversight Business Filings Incorporated, Lisa Rein, Debbie Shaw, WP Company, LLC, Faith Williams, filed by Michelle M Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(cp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle M Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joscelyn Funnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WP Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Williams
Represented By: John T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project on Government Oversight Business Filings Incorporated
Represented By: John T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?