Banks v. Booher et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Banks, Running River, Dale Arnold, Rambo and Carl L. Varner
Defendant: Superintendent Bradley Booher, Head Chaplain Henry Hansard, Tracy Smith, Kenneth Goodman, Jason Stauffer, Kelly Evans, Jennifer Rossman, Rev. Ulli Klemm, Ulrich Klemm, Laurel H. Harry and Craig Copper
Case Number: 1:2024cv00474
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SM
Referring Judge: SH
2 Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/Failed Authentication. Document #8 resend to Carl Varner with CCN. Mail sent to Carl Varner (ll)
May 13, 2024 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/Failed Authentication. Document #8 resent to Dale Arnold with CCN. Mail sent to Dale Arnold (ll)
May 13, 2024 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/Failed Authentication. Document #8 resent to Marvin Banks with CCN. Mail sent to Marvin Banks (ll)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Carl Varner and Dale Arnold SHALL FILE a signed amended complaint within (30) days of the date of this Order; and2. The Clerk of Court is directed to MAIL a copy of Pltfs amended complaint #5 to Pltfs, so that Carl Varner and Dale Arnold may sign that copy and return it to the Court within (30) days. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 4/23/24. (ma)
April 17, 2024 Receipt of payment from DALE ARNOLD in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 4/16/2024. Receipt number 111102123 processed by MB. (jjs)
April 17, 2024 Receipt of payment from CARL VARNER in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 4/16/2024. Receipt number 111102122 processed by MB. (jjs)
April 10, 2024 Receipt of payment from MARVIN BANKS in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA-PIF/Non-IFP. Transaction posted on 4/9/2024. Receipt number 111102088 processed by AA. (jjs)
April 8, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint with additional plaintiffs. Signed by LP on 04/08/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ll)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carl L. Varner, Bradley Booher, Craig Copper, Henry Hansard, Laurel H. Harry, Ulrich Klemm, filed by Dale Arnold, Marvin Banks, Carl L. Varner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(ll) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/8/2024) (ll).
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules) (ibr)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed on 03/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (ibr)
March 19, 2024 Filing 2 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ibr)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Marvin Banks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits) (ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Booher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Running River
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl L. Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Bradley Booher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head Chaplain Henry Hansard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stauffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev. Ulli Klemm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulrich Klemm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel H. Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Copper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?