J.S. et al v. Blue Mountain School District et al Featured Case

Plaintiff J.S., a minor, sued Defendants Blue Mountain School District, Superintendent Joyce E. Romberger and Principal James S. McGonigle. Plaintiff alleged that the school's discipline for creating a false internet profile purporting to be her school principal violated her civil rights.

Plaintiff: J.S., Terry Snyder and Steven Snyder
Defendant: Blue Mountain School District, Joyce E. Romberger and James S. McGonigle
Case Number: 3:2007cv00585
Filed: March 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2011 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Blue Mountain School District. (Riba, Jonathan)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER per Mandate from the 3rd Circuit, Clerk of Court is directed to REOPEN CASE,; parties are directed to file a joint STATUS REPORT w/i 14 days listing any issues that remain and indicating the manner in which they seek to proceed. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/21/11. (sm, )
July 6, 2011 Filing 60 MANDATE of USCA as to 56 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven Snyder, J.S., Terry Snyder (Attachments: # 1 Mandate Letter, # 2 Opinion)(Koperna, Tina)
February 4, 2010 Filing 59 JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to 56 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Snyder, J.S., Terry Snyder (Koperna, Tina)
October 15, 2008 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER REQUEST by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder for proceedings held on July 8, 2008 before Judge James M. Munley, (Kohart, Mary)
October 10, 2008 Filing 57 USCA Case Number 08-4138 for 56 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Snyder, J.S., Terry Snyder. USCA Case Manager Tina Koperna (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF). (Koperna, Tina)
October 6, 2008 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case as to 55 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 03140000000001399759. Court Reporter Suzanne Halko. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Nissen, Meredith)
September 11, 2008 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM and ORDER DENYING pltfs' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment ; GRANTING defendants' motion for summary judgment 33 ; Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE case.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/11/08 (sm, )
April 14, 2008 Filing 54 Argument re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2008 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 4/14/08. (sm, )
January 21, 2008 Filing 53 REPLY BRIEF re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs filed by J.S..(Roper, Mary)
January 17, 2008 Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District.(Riba, Jonathan)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER approving 48 Stipulation filed by J.S. re dismissal of dfts McGonible and RombergerSigned by Honorable James M. Munley on 1/9/08. (sm, )
January 7, 2008 Filing 50 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service and Exhibits to be filed Traditionally filed by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder.(Nissen, Meredith)
January 7, 2008 Filing 49 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs filed by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District. (Attachments: # 1 Response Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Response to Plaintiffs' Statment of Material Facts, # 3 Proposed Order)(Riba, Jonathan)
January 7, 2008 Filing 48 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants McGonigle and Romberger by all Plaintiffs by J.S.. (Roper, Mary)
December 11, 2007 Filing 47 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service and Exhibits to be filed Traditionally filed by J.S..(Roper, Mary)
December 11, 2007 Filing 46 APPENDIX by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 3 of 3). (Nissen, Meredith)
December 10, 2007 Filing 45 APPENDIX by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 2 of 3). (Nissen, Meredith)
December 10, 2007 Filing 44 APPENDIX by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 1 of 3). (Nissen, Meredith)
December 10, 2007 Filing 43 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs filed by J.S.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unpublished opinions# 2 Appendix unpublished opinion)(Roper, Mary)
December 10, 2007 Filing 42 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service and Exhibits to be filed Traditionally filed by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District.(Riba, Jonathan)
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages : Deft's motion to esceed the page limitation w/ regard to the brief in support of summary judgment is GRANTED to the extent that the brief may exceed fifteen (15) pages, but be no longer than thirty (30) pages; Pltfs' brief in support of their motion for summary judgment may also be thrity (30) pages long; Opposition briefs filed by both parties should be no longer than fifteen (15) pages as both sides will already have set forth their positions in their supporting briefs; Parties shall be allowed to file a brief of no more than five (5) pages in reply to the opposition brief; ALL OTHER REQUIREMENTS REGARDING FONT AND LINE SPACING FOUND IN THE LOCAL RULES OF COURT MUST BE SCRUPULOUSLY FOLLOWED; Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 12/06/07 (ep, )
December 5, 2007 Filing 40 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation with Certificate of Concurrence and Certificate of Service by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Riba, Jonathan)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend Time to file supporting briefs Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 11/28/07 (sm, )
November 26, 2007 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to To File Supporting Briefs to Dispositive Motions and Subsequent Reply Briefs by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Riba, Jonathan)
November 25, 2007 Filing 37 STATEMENT OF FACTS CORRECTED filed by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder.(Nissen, Meredith)
November 23, 2007 Filing 36 EXHIBIT by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service and Exhibits to be filed Traditionally. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) # 2 Exhibit(s) # 3 Exhibit(s))(ch, )
November 21, 2007 Filing 35 STATEMENT OF FACTS re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs filed by J.S..(Roper, Mary)
November 21, 2007 Filing 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs by J.S.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roper, Mary)
November 21, 2007 Filing 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service and Exhibits to be filed Traditionally by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontested Facts# 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Non-Concurrence# 4 Exhibit List)(Riba, Jonathan)
November 7, 2007 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith W. Nissen on behalf of all plaintiffs (Nissen, Meredith)
November 7, 2007 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Kohart on behalf of all plaintiffs (Kohart, Mary)
October 16, 2007 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney Meredith Nissan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 1132180. by J.S..(Roper, Mary)
October 2, 2007 Filing 29 STENO NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Suzanne Halko of TRO before Judge Munley on 3/29/07. (Court Reporter Notes/Tapes are not viewable pdf documents). (rm, )
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery due by 10/22/2007. Dispositive motions due 11/21/07.Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 8/20/07 (sm, )
August 14, 2007 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Case Management Deadlines by J.S.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roper, Mary)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGMEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 8/21/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 9/20/2007.Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 5/10/07. (sm, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Plaintiffs and Defendants by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. (Roper, Mary)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 4/25/07. (sm, )
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2007 09:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 4/25/07. (sm, )
April 23, 2007 Filing 21 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District.(Katz, Ellis)
April 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING 19 Stipulation filed by Blue Mountain School District, James S. McGonigle, Joyce E. Romberger re answerSigned by Judge James M. Munley on 4/20/07. (sm, )
April 18, 2007 Filing 19 STIPULATION (Amended) to Extend Date of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by One Week by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District. (Katz, Ellis)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING 17 Stipulation filed by Blue Mountain School District, James S. McGonigle, Joyce E. Romberger re extension of time to respond until 4/22/07Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 4/17/07. (sm, )
April 16, 2007 Filing 17 STIPULATION (Joint) to Extend Date of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by One Week by Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District. (Katz, Ellis) IMAGE DELETED Modified on 4/17/2007 (sm, ).
April 2, 2007 Filing 16 Corrected Memorandum in support of Motion for TRO per LR 5.2(d)2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Roper, Mary)
April 2, 2007 Filing 15 Corrected Motion for TRO per LR 5.2(d)2. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roper, Mary)
April 2, 2007 Filing 14 Corrected Complaint Per L.R. 5.2(d)2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Roper, Mary)
March 30, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Riba on behalf of Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District (Riba, Jonathan)
March 30, 2007 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellis H. Katz on behalf of Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District (Katz, Ellis)
March 29, 2007 Filing 11 EXHIBIT #4 by J.S... (sm, )
March 29, 2007 Filing 10 EXHIBIT #3 by J.S... (sm, )
March 29, 2007 Filing 9 EXHIBIT #2 by J.S... (sm, )
March 29, 2007 Filing 8 EXHIBIT #1 by J.S... (sm, )
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 2 Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction.Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 3/29/07 (sm, )
March 28, 2007 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2007 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Judge James M. Munley on 3/28/07. (sm, )
March 28, 2007 Filing 4 VERIFICATION filed by plaintiffs. (kn, )
March 28, 2007 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(kn, ) Modified on 3/29/2007 (sm, ).
March 28, 2007 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kn, ) Modified on 3/29/2007 (sm, ).
March 28, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joyce E. Romberger, James S. McGonigle, Blue Mountain School District ( Filing fee $350, Receipt Number 998350), filed by J.S., Terry Snyder, Steven Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit(s))(kn, ) Modified on 3/29/2007 (sm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.S. et al v. Blue Mountain School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Snyder
Represented By: Mary Catherine Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Snyder
Represented By: Mary Catherine Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Mountain School District
Represented By: Jonathan P. Riba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce E. Romberger
Represented By: Jonathan P. Riba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. McGonigle
Represented By: Jonathan P. Riba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?