BabyAge..com, Inc. v. Leachco, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: BabyAge..com, Inc.
Defendant: Leachco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01600
Filed: August 30, 2007
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2009 109 Letter from Clerk's office to Patent & Trademark Office re: case closing. (rm, )
April 2, 2009 108 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER, ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/2/09. (jam, )
March 31, 2009 107 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Leachco, Inc., BabyAge..com, Inc., Leachco, John M. Kiefer, Jr., Jamie S Leach. (Peterson, Gary)
March 30, 2009 106 Featured Case ORDER: AND NOW, this 30th day of March, 2009, based upon the representations of counsel that the above-captioned matter has been settled it is hereby ORDERED AND DECREED that that anti-trust claims of Plaintiff, BabyAge.com, Inc. against Defendant, Leachco, Inc., previously withdrawn without prejudice in this Court's Order ented and filed on April 11, 2008, are neither affected nor intended to be affected by this settlement. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/30/09. (jam, )
March 24, 2009 104 MOTION TO EXCUSE COUNSEL'S PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Gary)
March 10, 2009 103 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection/Trial set for 4/13/2009 09:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable A. Richard Caputo. Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/09 at 9:30 a.m. in Chambers, Wilkes-Barre before Honorable A. Richard Caputo. All motions in limine, along with supporting briefs shall be filed by 3/25/09. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/10/09. (jam, )
January 12, 2009 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BabyAge..com, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff-Counterclaim Defendant Baby Age's motion for summary judgment as to non-infringement of the '934 Patent (Doc. 84) is GRANTED. (2) Plaintiff-Counterclaim Defendant Baby Age's motion for summary judgment on Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff Leachco's claim for violation of the Lanham Act (Doc. 84) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/12/09. (jam, )
December 1, 2008 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr. of Pretrial Disclosures (Katsock, Andrew)
December 1, 2008 100 DISCLOSURE REPORT by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr. by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr..(Katsock, Andrew)
November 10, 2008 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr. re 98 Answer to Complaint Third Amended Answer to Counterclaim (Katsock, Andrew)
November 10, 2008 98 THIRD AMENDED ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM, filed by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr..(Katsock, Andrew)
November 3, 2008 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc. re 96 Answer to Statement of Facts, 95 Reply Brief (Katsock, Andrew)
November 3, 2008 96 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS re 88 Certificate of Service Answer to Additional Material Facts filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
November 3, 2008 95 REPLY BRIEF re 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
October 27, 2008 93 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Leachco, Inc's and Jamie S. Leach's Request for Entry and Inspection is DENIED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/27/08. (jam, )
October 22, 2008 92 STATEMENT OF FACTS in Response to Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach.(Peterson, Gary)
October 22, 2008 91 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Leach declaration, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,760,934, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - screen shot of Babyage web site, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4 - image of Cozy Comfort pillow, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5 - image of Cozy Comfort pillow with model, # 6 Exhibit(s) image of Cozy Comfort pillow with model, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7 - chart comparing claims of '934 patent to Cozy Comfort pillow, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8 -- annotated version of Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9 - annotated version of Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10 -- annotated version of Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11 - screen short Leachco "featured brand" page on Babyage web site, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12 - screen shot, enlarged view of "Pregnancy Pillows" section of Leachco "featured brands" page, Babyage web site, # 13 Exhibit(s) 13 - screen shot of Cozy Comfort pillow page linked to Leachco "featured brands" page, Babyage web site, # 14 Exhibit(s) 14 - Peterson declaration)(Peterson, Gary)
October 22, 2008 90 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against John M. Kiefer, Jr. by Leachco, Inc., Leachco, Jamie S Leach.(jam, )
October 22, 2008 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion of Leachco, Inc. and Jamie S. Leach For Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Doc. 72) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach the Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Doc. 72-2) attached to Defendants' Motion and file it of record forthwith. The Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims shall be deemed to have been served on the date of this Order for the purpose of determining the time for response under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 (a). Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/22/08. (jam, )
October 7, 2008 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 85 Rule 56.1 STATEMENT, 86 Brief in Support, and 87 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, filed by by BabyAge.com, Inc. (Katsock, Andrew) Modified on 10/8/2008 (rm, ).
October 7, 2008 87 CERTIFICATE OF NONCONCURRENCE for 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by BabyAge..com, Inc.(Katsock, Andrew) Modified on 10/8/2008 (rm, ).
October 7, 2008 86 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew) Modified on 10/8/2008 (rm, ).
October 7, 2008 85 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT, in support of 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew) Modified on 10/8/2008 (rm, ).
October 7, 2008 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
October 3, 2008 83 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant, BabyAge.com, Inc's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 81) is deemed withdrawn. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/3/08 (jam, )
September 26, 2008 82 Rule 56.1 STATEMENT by BabyAge..com, Inc., in support of 81 Motion for Summary Judgment.(Katsock, Andrew)
September 26, 2008 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
September 18, 2008 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Patent Claims Construction. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/18/08. (jam, )
September 5, 2008 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc. re 78 Response to Discovery (Katsock, Andrew)
September 5, 2008 78 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Leachco, Inc and Jamie S. Leach by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
August 29, 2008 77 REPLY BRIEF re 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - August 5, 2008 email from Gary Peterson to Andrew Katsock)(Peterson, Gary)
August 27, 2008 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc. re 74 Brief in Opposition, and by JOHN M. KIEFER, JR (Katsock, Andrew)
August 27, 2008 74 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim filed by JOHN M. KIEFER, JR and filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
August 15, 2008 73 BRIEF in Support re 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, filed by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. Related document: 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Jamie S Leach, Leachco, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - screen shot of Babyage storefront web page on amazon.com, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - screen shot of babyage.com web page, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Babyage answers to interrogatories)(Peterson, Gary)
August 15, 2008 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Amended Pleading, # 2 Exhibit(s) B - Marked-Up Version of Proposed Amended Pleading, # 3 Exhibit(s) C - Proposed Order)(Peterson, Gary)
July 21, 2008 70 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by BabyAge..com, Inc. re 69 Memorandum of Law, 68 Memorandum of Law Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Markman Memorandum. (Katsock, Andrew)
July 11, 2008 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach re Patent Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - U.S. Patent No. 6,760,934, # 2 Exhibit(s) B - excerpt, New Oxford American Dictionary, # 3 Exhibit(s) C - screen shot, Babyage.com web site)(Peterson, Gary)
July 10, 2008 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by BabyAge..com, Inc. Markman Memorandum. (Katsock, Andrew)
June 25, 2008 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 64 Motion to Withdraw Affirmative Defense. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/25/08 (jam, )
June 24, 2008 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr. re 64 MOTION to Withdraw Affirmative Defense (Katsock, Andrew)
June 24, 2008 65 CERTIFICATE of Concurrence by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr. re 64 MOTION to Withdraw Affirmative Defense. (Katsock, Andrew)
June 24, 2008 64 MOTION to Withdraw Affirmative Defense by BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr..(Katsock, Andrew)
June 3, 2008 63 Featured Case ORDER Approving 62 Stipulation re: paragraph 36 of the Second Amended Answer to COunterclaims filed 5/2/08. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/3/08. (jam, )
May 30, 2008 62 STIPULATION by Leachco, Inc., BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr., Jamie S Leach. (Peterson, Gary)
May 29, 2008 Document #60 deleted due to clerical error. (hm, )
May 21, 2008 61 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) Claims Construction (Markman) Briefs shall be filed by 7/11/08. Rebuttals by 7/21/08. (2) Case is assigned to Standard track, and placed on the April, 2009 trial list. (3) Discovery due by 11/1/2008. (4) Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2008. (5) Motions to amend pleadings due by 7/31/08. (6) Expert Witness reqmts: pltf by 11/1/08; Defts by 12/1/08; Supplementals by 12/15/08. (7) Disclosures due by 12/1/08. (8) All Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2008. (9) Pretrial Conference set for 3/2009, date and time to be announced in Wilkes-Barre before Honorable A. Richard Caputo. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/21/08. (rm, )
May 21, 2008 59 PROTECTIVE ORDER - covering documents, materials, testimonuy or information generated or produced during discovery. See order for complete details.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/21/08. (rm, )
May 15, 2008 57 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Leachco, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr., BabyAge..com, Inc., Leachco, Jamie S Leach. (Peterson, Gary)
May 8, 2008 56 Featured Case ORDER scheduling a Case Management Conference for 5/20/2008 02:30 PM in Chambers, Wilkes-Barre before Honorable A. Richard Caputo.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/8/08. (hm, )
May 2, 2008 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 54 Second Amended Answer to Third Party Complaint, filed by Counterclaim Defendants and Third Party Defendants by John M. Kiefer, Jr. & BabyAge.com (Katsock, Andrew) Modified on 5/5/2008 (rm, ).
May 2, 2008 54 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to 52 Counterclaim by Leachco & John Leach , filed by Counterclaim Defendants and Third Party Defendants John M. Kiefer, Jr. & BabyAge.com. (Katsock, Andrew) Modified on 5/5/2008 (rm, ).
April 22, 2008 53 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 44 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 04/22/08 (ep, )
April 14, 2008 52 ANSWER to 42 Amended Complaint, Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John M. Kiefer, Jr., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against BabyAge..com, Inc. by Leachco, Inc..(Peterson, Gary)
April 11, 2008 51 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Pltf's 48 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Count II of its Amended Complaint w/o prejudice. Accordingly, Count II of Pltf's Amended Complaint concerning Pltf's anti-trust claims against Deft Leachco, Inc. is hereby dismissed w/o prejudice. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/11/08. (rm, )
April 10, 2008 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc. re 48 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 49 Certificate of Counsel of Concurrence (Katsock, Andrew)
April 10, 2008 49 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Concurrence by Andrew J. Katsock, III on behalf of BabyAge..com, Inc. (Katsock, Andrew)
April 10, 2008 48 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
March 31, 2008 47 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Leachco, Inc..(Peterson, Gary)
March 31, 2008 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief. Defendant is granted leave to file a 29 page brief in support of its pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/31/08. (hm, )
March 26, 2008 45 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Oversize Brief by Leachco, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Gary)
March 26, 2008 44 MOTION to Dismiss by Leachco, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Gary)
March 20, 2008 43 Memorandum ORDER denying as moot 30 Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff Leachco, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/20/08. (hm, )
March 17, 2008 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants, filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(rm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 1 Main Document) (hm, ).
March 17, 2008 41 Featured Case ORDER (1) Granting 34 Motion to Amend Complaint. (2) In accordance w/Local Rule 15.1(a), the Clerk is directed to file of record Pltf's Amended Complaint. Deft shall be deemed to have been served for the purpose of determining the time for response under FRCP15(a) on the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/17/08. (rm, )
March 6, 2008 40 Featured Case ORDER approving 38 Withdrawal of Counterclaim against Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff/Third Party Plaintiff, Leachco, Inc. filed by John M. Kiefer, Jr. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 03/06/08. (ep, ) Modified on 3/12/2008 (hm, ).
March 4, 2008 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John M. Kiefer, Jr. re 38 Withdrawal of Claim (Katsock, Andrew)
March 4, 2008 38 WITHDRAWAL of Claim re 25 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim by John M. Kiefer, Jr.. (Katsock, Andrew)
March 4, 2008 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BabyAge..com, Inc. re 35 Brief in Support, 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint (Katsock, Andrew)
March 4, 2008 36 CERTIFICATE of of Concurrence by BabyAge..com, Inc. re 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. (Katsock, Andrew)
March 4, 2008 35 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Katsock, Andrew)
March 4, 2008 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by BabyAge..com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) Marked Up Original Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order)(Katsock, Andrew)
February 22, 2008 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Third Party Pliantiffs Motion to Strike the patent invalidity and inequitable conduct defenses alleged at page 3, paragraph 16, and parge 4, paragraph 21 of the 25 Answer to Third Party Complaint and Counterclaim filed by John M. Kiefer, Jr. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/22/08. (hm, )
February 19, 2008 32 Unopposed MOTION to Strike 25 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim by Leachco, Jamie S Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Gary)
February 19, 2008 31 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Leachco.(Peterson, Gary)
February 19, 2008 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Leachco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Gary)
February 12, 2008 29 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part as moot 13 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and granting in part and denying in part 16 Defendant's Motion to Amend its Answer. See Order for details. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/12/08. (hm, )
February 6, 2008 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Mitchell A. Smolow. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/6/08. (hm, )
February 4, 2008 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John M. Kiefer, Jr. re 24 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance, 25 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim (Katsock, Andrew)
February 2, 2008 26 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Order to Withdraw As Counsel by BabyAge..com, Inc.. (Smolow, Mitchell)
February 1, 2008 25 ANSWER to 8 Third Party Complaint,, ANSWER to 8 Third Party Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Leachco by John M. Kiefer, Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Katsock, Andrew)
February 1, 2008 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Katsock, III on behalf of BabyAge..com, Inc., John M. Kiefer, Jr. (Katsock, Andrew)
January 9, 2008 23 Statement of Concurrence To Motion to Withdraw. (Smolow, Mitchell)
January 4, 2008 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Third Party Complaint. John M. Kiefer, Jr. is granted a thirty day extension to file his Answer. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/4/08. (hm, )
January 4, 2008 21 Proposed Order To Motion To Extend Time For Kiefer Answer. (Smolow, Mitchell)
January 3, 2008 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Third Party Complaint, by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Smolow, Mitchell)
December 19, 2007 19 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach.(Peterson, Gary)
December 19, 2007 18 REPLY BRIEF re 13 MOTION to Strike 11 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - AIPLA Economic Survey)(Peterson, Gary)
December 11, 2007 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Answer to Counterclaim filed by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Smolow, Mitchell)
December 11, 2007 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct 11 Answer to Counterclaim by BabyAge..com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 amended answer# 2 marked-up amended answer)(Smolow, Mitchell)
December 11, 2007 15 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 13 MOTION to Strike 11 Answer to Counterclaim filed by BabyAge..com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 unpublished opinion)(Smolow, Mitchell)
November 28, 2007 14 BRIEF in Support re 13 MOTION to Strike 11 Answer to Counterclaim, filed by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. Related document: 13 MOTION to Strike 11 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Jamie S Leach, Leachco, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - decision in Anticancer Inc. v. Xenogen Corp.)(Peterson, Gary)
November 28, 2007 13 MOTION to Strike 11 Answer to Counterclaim by Leachco, Inc., Jamie S Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Gary)
November 26, 2007 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Leachco. John M. Kiefer, Jr. waiver sent on 11/7/2007, answer due 1/7/2008. (Peterson, Gary)
November 20, 2007 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim by BabyAge..com, Inc..(Smolow, Mitchell)
November 15, 2007 10 THIRD Party Summons Issued as to John M. Kiefer, Jr. - forwarded to Atty Sean Kemether for service. (rm, )
November 8, 2007 9 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Gary Peterson signed by Judge A. Richard Caputo on 11/8/07. (hm, )
November 7, 2007 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John M. Kiefer, Jr., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John M. Kiefer, Jr., filed by Leachco.(Kemether, Sean)
November 6, 2007 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gary S. Peterson on behalf of Leachco, Inc. Attorney Gary Peterson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 1145674., filed by on behalf of Leachco, Inc..(Peterson, Gary)
November 5, 2007 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Sean V. Kemether. (jc)
November 2, 2007 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (Kemether, Sean)
November 2, 2007 5 LEACHCO, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Leachco, Inc..(Kemether, Sean)
October 18, 2007 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by BabyAge..com, Inc.. Leachco, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2007, answer due 11/23/2007. (Smolow, Mitchell)
September 5, 2007 3 Featured Case Letter ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures signed by Judge A. Richard Caputo on 9/5/07. (hm, )
August 30, 2007 Summons Issued as to Leachco, Inc. and mailed to Atty Smolow for service on Defendant. (rm, )
August 30, 2007 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1. (rm, )
August 30, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Leachco, Inc., filed by BabyAge..com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BabyAge..com, Inc. v. Leachco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BabyAge..com, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Smolow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leachco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?