Freeman v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Freeman
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Joseph J. Piazza, Lt. Jordan, Lt. Moyer, Officer Studlack, Officer Bowers, Officer Fornwald, Officer Lahr, Lisa Shay Kerns-Barr and Ms. McCathy
Case Number: 3:2007cv02191
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Northumberland
Presiding Judge: LQ
Presiding Judge: Thomas I. Vanaskie
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUMand ORDER granting 181 Corrections Dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment ; Pltf's motion 151 for summary judgment is DENIED re claims against the Corrections Defendants;and Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE case.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 3/31/11 (sm, )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM and ORDER GRANTING 185 DFt Ann Batdorf, RN's Motion for Summary Judgment ; DENYING pltf's motion for summ/jdg against dft Batdorf; Summary jugment will be entered in favor of Dft Batdorf.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/22/11 (sm, )
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying 156 Motion for spoliation and adverse inference sanction. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 1/11/11 (sm, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT Defendant Ann Batdorfs motion to dismiss (Dkt. Entry # 48) is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Thomas I. Vanaskie on 9/16/09. (jfg)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 1. Plaintiffs motion for jury demand (Dkt. Entry 14) is dismissed as moot. 2. Plaintiffs motion for counsel (Dkt. Entry 15) is denied without prejudice. 3. Plaintiffs motion for default judgment (Dkt. Entry 17) is denied. 4. Plai ntiffs motion to serve documents on Defendants counsel (Dkt. Entry 19) is dismissed as moot. 5. Plaintiffs motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Dkt. Entry 22) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted to the extent that A nn M. Batdorf will be substituted for the Jane Doe defendant, and Kyle Confer will be substituted for the John Doe defendant. The motion is denied in all other respects. 6. The Clerk of Court is directed to add the names of the newly identified Defen dants on the docket. 7. The United States Marshal is directed to serve Plaintiffs complaint (Dkt. Entries 1, 2) on the newly identified Defendants, Batdorf and Confer.8. Within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, Defendants shall file ares ponse to Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery. (Dkt. Entry 28.) The failureto do so will result in the motion being deemed unopposed. 9. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike from the record Plaintiffs reply to Defendants answer to the complaint. (Dkt. Entry 21.) The Clerk is also directed to strike from the record and return to Plaintiff his filing of July 25, 2008. (Dkt. Entry 29.) 10. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. Entry 28) is dismissed. 11. The Clerk of Court is directed to reflect Plaintiffs demand for a jury trial on the docket. 12. The parties shall complete all discovery in this matter within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Any dispositive motions shall be filed within thirty (30) days from the close of discovery. Signed by Honorable Thomas I. Vanaskie on 12/11/08. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Studlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Fornwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Shay Kerns-Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. McCathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?