Shuey et al v. Schwab et al
Plaintiff: |
Susan R. Shuey and John Shuey |
Defendant: |
William G. Schwab, East Penn Township, Brian P. Horos and Alan W. Beishline |
Case Number: |
3:2008cv01190 |
Filed: |
June 23, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Scranton Office |
County: |
Carbon |
Presiding Judge: |
Unassigned1 |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 4, 2010 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 4 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs'Complaint filed by William G. Schwab. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: (1) Counts I, III, V, an d VII are DISMISSED. (2) Plaintiff John Shuey's claims at Counts II, IV, VI, and VIII are DISMISSED. (3) Defendant William Schwab is DISMISSED. (4) Defendant East Penn Township is DISMISSED. (5) Plaintiffs' requests for injunctive relie f is DISMISSED. (6) Plaintiffs' claims against William Schwab, Brian Horos, and Alan Beishline in their official capacities are DISMISSED. (7) Defendants' motion is DENIED as to the remaining Counts. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/4/10. (jam, )
|
December 17, 2009 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 13) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their brief in opposition ot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. 4) within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/17/09. (jam, )
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiffs Susan and John Shuey's Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's September 9, 2008 Order (Doc. 12) is DENIED. (2) Plaintiffs Susan and John Shuey's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Doc. 16) is DENIED as moot. (3) The Clerk of the Court shall mark this matter CLOSED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/2/08. (jam, )
|
September 9, 2008 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants William G. Schwab, East Penn Township, Officer Brian P. Horos, and Officer Alan W. Beishline's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/9/08. (jam, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?