Bruno et al v. Bozzuto's, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Michael Bruno, Lisa Bruno and Bruno's Market, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Bozzuto's, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00874 |
Filed: |
May 7, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Scranton Office |
County: |
Luzerne |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas I. Vanaskie |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 19, 2015 |
Filing
253
ORDER: In accordance with the MEMORANDUM filed previously as separate docket entry no. 252): Defendant's Daubert Motion to Predluce Plaintiffs' Expert Damages Report and Testimony 202 is GRANTED. A telephonic status is set for 12/8/2015 10:00 AM to discuss the timeframe for the filing of all relevant papers related to Defendant's fee award. (See Order for complete details.)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/19/15. (km)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
234
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 224 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Dated July 30, 2015 (Doc. 223) filed by Bruno's Market II, Michael Bruno, Bruno's Market, Inc., Lisa Bruno. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/31/15. (km)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
212
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/23/15. (km)
|
February 6, 2012 |
Filing
127
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 1.Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Bruno's Market II, Inc. (Doc. 64) is DENIED.2.Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV, and Vof Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 113) is GRANTED. 3. Defendant's Mot ion for Sanctions (Doc. 94) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Assuming such information still exists, Plaintiffs are directed to take such actions as are necessary to obtain original source materials from the RORC system in AWl's possession and to bear all costs associated with such retrieval. This directive includes, if necessary, the filing of a motion to compel in this case, or initiating a separate action to compel production. Plaintiffs will bear any and all costs associated with such transfer of information. If the requested data are no longer in AWl's possession, the Court will reconsider its ruling.4. Within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order, Defendant shall file its Answer to the Second Amended Complaint.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/6/12. (jfg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?