Ruff v. Health Care Administrator et al
Plaintiff: John Ruff
Defendant: Health Care Administrator, Kathryn McCarty, SCI Coal Township and SCI Coal Township Medical Staff
Case Number: 3:2010cv00603
Filed: March 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
Presiding Judge: PT
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The medical defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 24) is granted. 2. All claims against the defendants arriving prior to 3/18/08, are barred by the statute of limitations. 3. Mr. Ru ff's Eighth Amendment claims of deliberate indifference against PA Davis, PA Colabine, and Dr. Weisner, are dismissed for failure to state a claim. 4. All claims against David Sabbar are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to clsoe this case. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/8/11 (jam, )
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/2/10 (jam, )
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 12 Motion to Produce. IT IS ORDERED that: 1.Mr. Ruffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel (doc. 9) is denied without prejudice.2 .Mr. Ruffs Motion for Extension of Time (doc. 10) is granted.3.Mr. Ruff shall file an Amended Complaint in this matter on or before June 7, 2010. 4.Failure to submit an Amended Complaint will result in the dismissal of Mr. Ruffs action without prejudice.5.Mr. Ruffs Motion to Produce Documents (doc. 12) is denied without prejudice.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/26/10 (jam, )
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 5) is granted.2. Mr. Ruffs claim against SCI-Coal Township, SCI-Coal Townships Medical Staff, the Health Care Administrator, and Kathry n McCarthy is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted.3.Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Mr. Ruff may file an amended complaint, complete within itself, n aming those individuals involved in the alleged claim deliberate indifference to his medical needs.4. The Clerk of Court is directed to sent Mr. Ruff two (2) copies of this courts form civil-rights complaint which Plaintiff should use in preparing his amended complaint.5. Failure to submit an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of Mr. Ruffs Complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/14/10. (jam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruff v. Health Care Administrator et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Coal Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Coal Township Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?