Robinson v. Varano et al
Plaintiff: La'Brent Robinson
Defendant: David Varano, Robert McMillan, George Miller, Scicchitano, Morris Stetler and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2010cv02131
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Blewitt
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - pltf's objections to R&R (doc. 85) are dismissed.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 7/10/13. (th)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.67) is GRANTED. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants and against Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case and to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Magistrate Judge.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 7/9/13. (ga)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 60 Plaintiff's motion Clarifying Defendant John Doe's Identification (doc. 60). Clerk of Court is directed to amend the docket in this case and to substitute Correctional Officer Dunn as Defendant John Doe. Clerk is also d irected to issue process to the U.S. Marshal, who shall serve Plaintiff's Doc. 23 Amended Complaint upon Defendant Correctional Officer Dunn of SCI-Coal Township in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4. Plaintiff's August 24, 2012 Motion for extension of time (Doc 61) is denied as moot. Clerk of Court is directed to remove the August 7, 2012 Order, Doc 56, from the docket in Plaintiff's Robinson's case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt on 8/29/2012 (admin, )
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - The February 9, 2012 Report and Recommendation (Doc. 46) of Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt is ADOPTED, in part. Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate Judg's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 49) are OVERRULED, in part, and SUSTA INED in part. The above-captioned case is REMANDED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum and Order (See Order for further details).Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 7/2/12. (ga, ) Modified on 7/2/2012 (ga, ).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The December 27, 2010 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. 15) is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 2) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proc eed in forma pauperis (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's secont Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 12) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's second Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 18) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Complaint (D oc. 1) and Amended Complaint (Doc. 19) are DISMISED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case and to FORWARD a copy of this Order to the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff may reopen this case by filing an amended complaint to thi s civil number within twenty (20) days of this Order, and, in the event the case is reopened, the Clerk of Court shall docket all documents to this term and number and shall remand the case to Magistrate Judge for further proceedings.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 1/25/11. (ga, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Varano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Brent Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Varano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scicchitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Stetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?