September 13, 2012 |
Filing
81
ORDER re 80 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:(1)Upon review of Magistrate Judge Carlsons Report and Recommendation (Doc. 77) for plain error or manifest injustice, the Report and Recommendation (Do c. 77) is ADOPTED. The case is placed on the January 2013 trial list. A pretrial scheduling order will follow.(2)Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 76) is conditionally granted.(A)The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of this Ord er to the Chair of the Federal Bar Association's Pro Bono Committee, Stephen M. Greecher, Jr., Esquire, Tucker, Arensberg & Swartz, 111 North Front Street, P.O. Box 889, Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, 171080889, who shall select, or affect the select ion of a member of the Bar Association to represent Plaintiff, Angel Muniz, in this matter.(B)Appointed counsel for Plaintiff is directed to file an entry of appearance with the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/13/12. (jam, )
|
March 1, 2012 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM OPINION - Accordingly, for the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the complaint (Doc. 63 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall docket the amended complaint (Doc. 63 , Exhibit) as a separate entry on the docke t of this action. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint in accordance with the requirements set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 1, 2012. (kjn )
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
57
MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. Pltfs unsupported motions to compel (Docs. 36 , 38 ) these motions are deemed withdrawn pursuant to Local Rule 7.5, and are DENIED without prejudice. 2.With respect to Pltfs motion to compel Dft Berdanier to provide further responses to Interrogatory Nos. 10, 11, and 20 (Doc. 39 ), the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 13, 2011. (kjn )
|
November 16, 2011 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. With respect to plaintiffs motions to compel (Docs. 36 , 38 ), plaintiff shall file a brief in support of these motions on or before Wednesday, November 30, 2011. 2. With respect to plaintiffs motio n to compel defendant Berdanier to provide further responses to Interrogatory Nos. 10, 11, and 20 (Doc. 38 ), defendant Berdanier shall provide for the Courts in camera inspection any further responsive information to these three interrogatories on or before Wednesday, November 30, 2011. 3. To the extent that plaintiff seeks any further relief in his motion to compel defendant Berdarnier to provide further answers to Interrogatory Nos. 10, 11, and 20, including any claim for monetary sanctions, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 16, 2011. (kjn )
|