Attanasio et al v. Community Health Systemsm, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Attanasio, Lynn Marie Potoski and Denise Gaiteri
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc., Wyoming Valley Health Care System and Wilkes-Barre Hospital Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00582
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). (1) The Joint Motion 199 is GRANTED, and the accompanying Settlement Agreement (Doc. 199-1) is APPROVED as a fair and reasonable resolution of this action under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). (2) The Parties shall proceed and provide the Notice of Settlement and accompanying Settlement Check to the participating Settlement Class Members in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. (3) All Participating Settlement Class Members, including the Named Plaintiffs, are permanently barred from prosecuting any of the released claims against any Releasees, as those terms are defined in the Settlement Agreement. (4) Named Plaintiffs Lynn Marie Potoski and Denise Gaiter i are each awarded Service Awards for their services to the class in the amount of $6,000 to be paid from the Gross Settlement Amount in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement.(5) Class Counsel is awarded attorneys fees in the amo unt of $280,000 as final payment for and complete satisfaction of any and all attorneys fees due and owed to Class Counsel. The payment of fees to Class Counsel shall be paid from the Gross Settlement Amount in accordance with the terms of the S ettlement Agreement. (6) Class Counsel is awarded reimbursement of litigation costs and expenses in the amount of $32,874 to be paid from the Gross Settlement Amount in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. (7) The Settlement Ad ministrator is awarded fees, costs, and expenses associated with the administration of the settlement in the amount of $6,000 to be paid from the Gross Settlement Amount in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. (8) The action is DISMISSED with prejudice, although jurisdiction is retained over this action for purposes of overseeing any disputes arising from the implementation, administration, or enforcement of the settlement terms, including any relating to the award of attorneys fees and costs. (9) The Clerk of Court is directed to mark the case as CLOSED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/14/2020. (dw)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). (1) The Motion for Summary Judgment 189 filed by Defendants Wyoming Valley Health Care System and Wilkes-Barre General Hospital is DENIED as to the Meal Break Class.(2) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the Uniform Class.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/15/19. (dw)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 60 MOTION for Conditional Certification filed by Lynn Marie Potoski, Denise Gaiteri Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/19/13. (jam)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow). Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/27/2012. (bg, )
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 13 Defendants'Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Collective Action Complaint. Plaintiffs have 21 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/20/11 (jam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attanasio et al v. Community Health Systemsm, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Attanasio
Represented By: Wayne A. Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Marie Potoski
Represented By: Wayne A. Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Gaiteri
Represented By: Wayne A. Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Valley Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkes-Barre Hospital Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?