Boldrini v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: |
Antonello Boldrini |
Defendant: |
Martin R Wilson, D. Peter Johnson, Jane Doe,, Daniel J. Barrett, F. Cortez Bell, III, William A Shaw, Jr. and Carol Ponce |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv01771 |
Filed: |
September 27, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Scranton Office |
County: |
Luzerne |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas M. Blewitt |
Presiding Judge: |
A. Richard Caputo |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 19, 2021 |
Filing
214
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff Boldrini's motion for reconsideration of the court's November 16th 2020 decision dismissing with prejudice his motion for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b)(1)-(6), Dic, 210, is DENIED, AND this case shall remain closed. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/19/21. (ga)
|
November 16, 2020 |
Filing
208
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Motion for relief from judgment (Doc. 201) is DISMISSED w/prejudice and this case shall remained closed.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/13/20. (ga)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
144
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 143 Motion for Recusal and to Stay Proceeding. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/1/14 (jam)
|
February 28, 2014 |
Filing
133
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 119 MOTION for Relief from Judgment filed by Antonello Boldrini Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/28/14. (jam)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing
93
ORDER re 92 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:(1)Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 65) is DENIED.(2)Plaintiffs Motion to Subpoena Record Direct to Defendants Martin R. Wilson, D. Peter Johns on, and Jane Doe from Union County, Pennsylvania (Doc. 72) is DENIED as moot.(3)Plaintiffs Motion to Subpoena Record Direct to Defendant Daniel J. Barrett from Bradford County, Pennsylvania (Doc. 73) is DENIED as moot.(4)Plaintiffs Motion to Subpoena Record Direct to Defendants William A. Shaw, Jr., and F. Cortez Bell, III, from Clearfield County, Pennsylvania (Doc. 74) is DENIED as moot. (5)Plaintiffs Motion to Subpoena Record Direct to Defendant Carol Ponce (Doc. 76) is DENIED as moot.(6)Plain tiffs Motion to Subpoena Record Direct to Pennsylvania State Police Commissioner Regarding Plaintiffs Criminal Record (Doc. 77) is DENIED as moot.(7)Plaintiffs Motion to the Court for Leave to File his 1-25-2013 Addendum to his Motion for Reconsidera tion (Doc. 79) is GRANTED.(8)Defendants Martin R. Wilson, Peter D. Johnson, Jane Doe, Daniel J. Barrett, F. Cortez Bell, III, and William A. Shaw, Jr.s Motion to Stay Discovery and Objections to Plaintiffs Motions to Subpoena Record and/or to Compel Discovery (Doc. 75) is DENIED as moot. (9)Plaintiffs Motion to Request Oral Argument (Doc. 89) is DENIED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/19/13. (jam)
|
December 27, 2012 |
Filing
64
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Magistrate Judge Blewitt's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 46) is ADOPTED. (See Order for complete details).Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/26/12. (ga)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?