Clinmicro Immunology Center, LLC v. Primemed, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Clinmicro Immunology Center, LLC
Defendant: Primemed, P.C. and Joan Salijko
Case Number: 3:2011cv02213
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Lackawanna
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's remaining state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant's remaining state law counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark the case as CLOSED. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 9/20/16. (jam)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 112 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 113 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 116 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 118 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Case listed for trial on remaining claims and counterclaims for November 2016 trial term. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/29/16. (jam)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 85 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Count II of Amended Complaint filed by Primemed, P.C. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/15/14. (jam)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/17/13. (jam)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:(1) Defendants PrimeMed and Joan Salijkos Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff ClinMicro Immunology Centers First Amended Complaint (Doc. 30) is DENIED.(2)Defendants shall file an answer to the First Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/14/12. (jam)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, Motions terminated: 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Primemed, P.C., Joan Salijko. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants PrimeMed, P.C., and Joan Salijkos Motion to Dismiss ClinMicro Immunology Center, LLCs Complaint (Doc. 10) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.(1)Defendants motion to dismiss the fraudulent inducement claim, Count V, and the duty of good faith and fair dealing claim, Count XII, is GRANTED. Counts V and XII are dismissed with prejudice.(2)Defendants motion to dis miss the tortious interference with contracts claims, Counts VI and VII, is GRANTED. The tortious interference with contracts claims are dismissed. Plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this Order to amend its complaint to pr operly plead its tortious interference with contract claims; otherwise, the claims will be dismissed with prejudice. (3)Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claims for breach of the Laboratory Services Agreement, Count II, conversion, Count VIII, accounting, Count IX, and civil conspiracy, Count X, is DENIED.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/23/12. (jam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinmicro Immunology Center, LLC v. Primemed, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinmicro Immunology Center, LLC
Represented By: Neal A. Jacobs
Represented By: Gene M. Linkmeyer
Represented By: Alan M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primemed, P.C.
Represented By: Brooke C. Madonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Salijko
Represented By: Brooke C. Madonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?