Brown et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Richard Brown and Arthur Johnson
Defendant: Kevin Smith and C.R. Treece
Case Number: 3:2012cv00446
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Presiding Judge: J. Andrew Smyser
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). The motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff(Doc.67) is DENIED. The motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants (Doc.60) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter summa ry judgment on behalf of Defendants and against Plaintiff on the basis of failure of Plaintiff to properly exhaust his claims. The stay previously imposed on Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery (doc. 66) is LIFTED, but the motion (Docc. 54) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 12/20/16. (ga)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. The motion to supplement is GRANTED. (Doc. 73 .) 2. The Report and Recommendation previously filed in this case (Doc. 72 ) is WITHDRAWN. 3. The parties are ORDERED to file supplemental briefs addressing their positions on the cross motions for summary judgment in light of the newly filed exhibit, Browns final administrative appeal, on or before January 8, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 18, 2015. (kjn)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Any decision with respect to Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery (Doc.54) is stayed pending resolution of Defendants' motion seeking summ ary judgment on the basis of failure to exhause administrative remedies. 2. Within twenty one (21) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to his brief in opposition to Defendants' summary judgment motion addressing the failure to exhaust argument.Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 4/10/15. (ga)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting in part 48 Report and Recommendations. This action is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Memorandum previously filed).Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 8/7/2014 (bg)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting in part 38 Report and Recommendations.; denying 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 8/28/2013 (bg)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. (See Order for further and complete details).Signed by Honorable Edwin M. Kosik on 10/24/12. (ga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Treece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?