Mincy v. Luzerne County Pennsylvania et al
Plaintiff: Hilton Karriem Mincy
Defendant: Luzerne County Pennsylvania, Chester B. Muroski, Carolee Medico Olenginiski, Bob Sypinewski and Samuel C. Stretton
Case Number: 3:2012cv00608
Filed: April 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Malachy E. Mannion
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER 1. Plaintiffs Objections, (Docs 328, 332), are OVERRULED. 2. The Report and Recommendation, (Doc. 327), is ADOPTED for the reasons stated therein. 3. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (Doc. 218), is DENIED. 4.Defendant's Motion for Surnmary Judgment, (Doc. 285), is GRANTED. 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/30/17. (jfg)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 209 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Hilton Karriem Mincy, 268 MOTION to Strike 265 Document Filed, filed by Hilton Karriem Mincy, 278 MOTION to Strike filed by Hilton Karriem Minc y, 248 MOTION Attach "Appendix H" to Second Amended Complaint filed by Hilton Karriem Mincy, 274 MOTION to Strike 257 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Hilton Karriem Mincy, 261 MOTION for Judgment filed by Hi lton Karriem Mincy, 266 MOTION to Strike 261 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's State Law Article 5, Section 9 Pennsylvania Constitution Claim filed by Bob Sypinewski, Samuel C. Stretton, Carolee Medico Olenginiski, Luzerne County Pennsylvania Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 11/20/2014. (cw)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- AND NOW, this 12th day of December, 2013, upon consideration of Plaintiffs Motion to Disqualify (Doc. 222) and a Motion for Recusal (Doc. 229), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Plaintiffs Motions are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 12/12/2013. (cw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mincy v. Luzerne County Pennsylvania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Karriem Mincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luzerne County Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester B. Muroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolee Medico Olenginiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Sypinewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel C. Stretton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?