Lakkis v. Lahovski et al
Plaintiff: Peter Lakkis
Defendant: Frederick J Lahovski and Joe Chacke
Case Number: 3:2012cv01024
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER 1. Plaintiffs Motion to Reopen Case and Enforce Settlement, (Doc. 93), is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs Motion to Reinstate Case, (Doc. 95), is GRANTED.3. A telephone scheduling conference SHALL BE CONDUCTED on Thursday September 1, 2016, at 10:45 a.m. for purposes of scheduling this matter for trial. Counsel for the Plaintiff is responsible for arranging the call to Chambers at(570) 207-5750 and all participants should be prepared to proceed before the undersigned is contacted. 4. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to reinstate this case. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/27/16. (jfg)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER 1. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 57) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, to wit: a. The motion is granted as to Plaintiffs claim that he was subjected to unlawful retaliation by Defendant Lahovski's failure to respo nd to his messages, and is likewise granted with respect to Plaintiffs claim that he was denied training, extra duty, and compensatory time in relation for his filing of the above-captioned action. b. The motion is denied as to all other remaining cl aims of the third amended complaint. 2. The case will be scheduled for trial on the remaining claims of the third amended complaint (Doc. 40). 3. A telephone scheduling conference will be held on Wednesday, May 6,2015, at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for the plaintiff is responsible for arranging the call to (570) 207-5750, and all parties should be ready to proceed before the undersigned is contacted.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/21/15. (jfg)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 41) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. a. Count I (Plaintiffs First Amendment retaliation claim), Count II (constitutional challenge to Special Order Memorandum), and Count III (§ 1983 conspi racy), are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2. Defendants' motion to dismiss paragraphs 51 through 56 in support of Count IV (Plaintiffs subsequent First Amendment retaliation claim) and Count IV itself is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/30/14. (jfg)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM and OPINION -For the foregoing reasons, the Court will grant Defendants' motion to dismiss but also will grant Plaintiff leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. A separate Order follows. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/30/13. (jfg)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - For the foregoing reasons, the Court will grant Defendants' motion to dismiss but also will grant Plaintiff leave to file an Amended Complaint. A separate Order follows.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/5/12. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lakkis v. Lahovski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lakkis
Represented By: Cynthia L. Pollick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick J Lahovski
Represented By: Robin B. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Chacke
Represented By: Robin B. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?