Good v. Firstenergy Corp.

Plaintiff: Connie Good
Defendant: Firstenergy Corp.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00149
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Scranton Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2016 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING 134 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Firstenergy Corp..Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 3/15/15. (sm)
February 9, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),DENYING pltf's MOTION in Limine 113 ; DENYING dft's 106 107 109 MOTIONS in Limine ; and GRANTING in part/DENYING in part Dft's ominibus MOTION in LIMINE- 111 *** SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS**Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/9/16. (sm)
November 3, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Firstenergy Corp. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 11/3/15. (sm)
May 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 5/30/13 (sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Good v. Firstenergy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Good
Represented By: James J. Conaboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstenergy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?