Summit Sheet Metal, LLC v. Sheet Metal Workers' International Association, Local Union No. 44
Plaintiff: Summit Sheet Metal, LLC
Defendant: Sheet Metal Workers' International Association, Local Union No. 44
Case Number: 3:2013cv01623
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM ORDER striking 40 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 41 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/17/15 (jam)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Summit Sheet Metal, LLC is directed to pay $4,461.25 in attorneys fees and $602.78 in costs to Sheet Metal Workers International Association, Local Union No. 44Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/13/15. (jam)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 3/28/14. (ao)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/26/13. (jam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Sheet Metal, LLC v. Sheet Metal Workers' International Association, Local Union No. 44
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Sheet Metal, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Katsock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheet Metal Workers' International Association, Local Union No. 44
Represented By: Charles W. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?