Kobrick v. Stevens et al
Plaintiff: |
Alexandra Kobrick |
Defendant: |
Matthew Stevens, Lakeland School District, Western Wayne School District, Margaret Billings-Jones, Thomas Kameroski, Andrew Falonk and Patrick Sheehan |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv02865 |
Filed: |
November 25, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Scranton Office |
County: |
Lackawanna |
Presiding Judge: |
Malachy E Mannion |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 11, 2018 |
Filing
201
ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Kobrick's MIL 178 is granted in part & denied in part.; 2. Stevens is precluded from denying the conduct to which he pled guilty in his criminal case in Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, PA.; 3. Kobrick's request for directed verdict on her claims sub judice is denied w/out prejudice to her right to renew her motion at teh appropriate time during trial. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/11/18. (ki)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
194
ORDER rez pltf's motion in limine 176 , directing pro se deft Matthew Stevens to file response brief to same by 4/9/2018 ir ct will deem motion to unopposed, & permitting pltf until 4/13/2018 to file reply. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/2/18. (ki)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
182
ORDER directing Clrk of Ct to designate deft Matthew Stevens as proceeding pro se, advising Stevens that pro se litigants must comply w/ FRCP, Federal Rules of Evidence, local rules of ct & ct orders, directing Stevens to file brs to pltfs' MILs 174 176 178 by 3/23/18 w/ pltf's ddl for replies 3/30/18, & noting all remaining ddls set forth in ct's order 148 remain in effect. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/9/18. (ki)
|
September 1, 2017 |
Filing
146
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendants motions (Docs. 102, 105, 107) are GRANTED.2. Entry of judgment in accordance with paragraph 1 is DEFERRED pending trial against the remaining defendant sub judice. 102 105 107 Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/1/2017. SEE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. (sc)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
61
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). defendant Stevenss motion to dismiss, (Doc. 32), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the Western Wayne defendants motion to dismiss, (Doc. 16), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the Lakeland defendants motion to dismiss, (Doc. 18), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (See order for details). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/30/14. (bs)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?