STI Oilfield Services, Inc. v. Access Midstream Partners, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: STI Oilfield Services, Inc.
Defendant: Access Midstream Partners, L.P., Appalachia Midstream Services, L.L.C., Chesapeake Energy Corporation and Chesapeake Operating, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02923
Filed: December 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. See Order for specific details The case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE> The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/21/18 (jam)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER THAT the Motion, (Doc. 81), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: 1. The Access Defendants' Motion is GRANTED with respect to Count XI (Fraud) of Plaintiffs Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment IN FAV OR of the Access Defendants and AGAINST the Plaintiff on this claim. 2. The Access Defendants' Motion, in all other respects, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT atelephone scheduling conference will be held on Tuesday, March 21, 2017 at 11:30 p.m. to schedule this case for trial. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for arranging the call to (570) 207-5750, and all parties should be ready to proceed before the undersigned is contacted.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/6/17. (jfg)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION - For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12) is GRANTED IN ! PART AND DENIED IN PART. Aseparate Order follows.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/22/14. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STI Oilfield Services, Inc. v. Access Midstream Partners, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STI Oilfield Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Campenni
Represented By: Howard M. Levinson
Represented By: Robert D. Schaub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Midstream Partners, L.P.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachia Midstream Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating, Inc.
Represented By: David E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?