Albert's Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Catamaran Corporation
Plaintiff: Albert's Pharmacy, Inc., Alert Pharmacy Services, Inc., Astrup Drug, Inc., Big Spring Pharmacy, Inc., Brundage's Waymart Pharmacy, Inc., BTBKMK LLC, Cambria Pharmacies, Inc., Cook's Pharmacy of Shavertown, Inc., County Line Pharmacy, Inc., D & B Discount Drugs, Inc., Dixons Pharmacy, Inc., Harrold's Pharmacy, Inc., Hose Pharmacy, Inc., KL Arnold Enterprise, Inc., Lakeview Pharmacy of Racine, Inc., Mill Street Pharmacy, Inc., Nisenholtz Pharmacy, Inc., P.B. Hillban LLC, Robert Schreiber, Inc., SCR, Inc., Sellersville Pharmacy, Inc., Shafer's Pharmacy, LLC, Slakoper, Inc., St. Clair Rexall Drug Co., Inc., Superior Care Pharmacy, Inc., Walter Cwietniewicz, West Perry Pharmacy, Inc., Willits Pharmacy Services, Inc. and Willits Road Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant: Catamaran Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv00290
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) The plaintiffs request to compel discovery is GRANTED IN PART. (See order for details).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/13/19. (bs)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)the deft's motion to quash is GRANTED.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/28/17. (bs)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) that pltf's motion to strike 58 is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/31/17. (bs)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)that Lakeview Pharmacy of Racine's 1st mot. for leave to amend the complaint is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. (See document for details.)Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 6/13/16. (bs)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). (1)The motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by defendant, Catamaran Corporation, (Doc. 11), is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part;(2)The defendants motion to dismiss with respect to Counts I, II, and IV of the Complaint, (Doc. 1), is GRANTED and the listed claims are dismissed with prejudice;(3)The defendants motion to dismiss with respect to Count III of the Complaint, (Doc. 1), is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/9/15. (bs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert's Pharmacy, Inc. et al v. Catamaran Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert's Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alert Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astrup Drug, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Spring Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brundage's Waymart Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BTBKMK LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cambria Pharmacies, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook's Pharmacy of Shavertown, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Line Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D & B Discount Drugs, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixons Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrold's Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hose Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KL Arnold Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeview Pharmacy of Racine, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mill Street Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nisenholtz Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.B. Hillban LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schreiber, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCR, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sellersville Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shafer's Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slakoper, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Clair Rexall Drug Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Care Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Cwietniewicz
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Perry Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willits Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willits Road Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Cuker
Represented By: Joseph Alan Venti
Represented By: Gerald J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamaran Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?