Wade v. Monroe County District Attorney et al
Plaintiff: Robert Muir Wade
Defendant: Monroe County District Attorney, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania and E. David Christie
Case Number: 3:2015cv00584
Filed: March 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: A. Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1.Count II of the complaint (access to courts) shall be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1);2.The Clerk is directed to enter JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff with respect to Count I of the complaint (procedural due process), pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure;3.The defendants shall take all steps reasonably necessary to preserve: the physical evidence taken from the victims body, including fingernails of the victim and any scrapings from those fingernails; the yellow turtleneck sweater worn by the victim and which had a bloodstain on the neck and body of the sweater; the lavender leather coat; the bra, underpants, pantyhose, and shoes of the victim; the trash bag in which the body of the victim was found; the contents of the laven der coat of the victim; and the inventory of the items found in the lavender coat;4.The defendants shall produce the evidence described in the preceding paragraph to the plaintiff for inspection and touch DNA testing;5.The defendants shall cooperate with the plaintiff in selecting a qualified laboratory for touch DNA testing of the evidence described in paragraph 3; and6.Within sixty (60) days after the date of this Order, the parties shall file a joint status report with respect to their progress or performance under paragraphs 3, 4, and 5 of this Order.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/13/19. (ms)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 32) is DENIED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/15/18. (ms)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 9/29/2017. (rm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Monroe County District Attorney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Muir Wade
Represented By: Cheryl J. Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County District Attorney
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. David Christie
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?