Abu-Jamal et al v. Kerestes et al
Plaintiff: Mumia Abu-Jamal, Bret Grote and Robert Boyle
Defendant: John Kerestes and Geisinger Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2015cv00967
Filed: May 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: Robert D. Mariani
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER denying 248 Medical Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 251 Corrections Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Corrections Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's claims against the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. In all other respects, the Corrections Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/10/18 (jam)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER 1. Plaintiff's Motion to File aThird Amended Complaint, (Doc. 179), is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff shall file the Third Amended Complaint, previously filed as an attachment to Plaintiffs Motion to File aThird Amended Complaint, (Doc. 179-1), within 7 days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/10/17. (jfg)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Plaintiffs Objections (Doc. 42) are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 39) is OVERRULED. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 23) is DENIED. Plaintiffs "Motion to Supplement Record of Motion for Preliminary Injunction" (Doc. 186) is DENIED AS MOOT.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/31/2016. (bg)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER upon consideration of Defendant Geisinger's "Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended and Supplemental Complaint(Doc. 63), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT said Motion is GRANTED. The claims against Geisinger Medical Center are DISMISSED with prejudice.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/5/16. (jfg)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER upon consideration of Defendants Lisiak, Khanum, and Saxon's "Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint" (Doc. 110), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT said Motion is DENIED.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/22/16. (jfg)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION AND ORDER - THAT said Motion is DENIED. The Court's denial of the Motion to Strike should not be construed by any of the parties as reflecting an opinion on the ability of Plaintiff to substantiate in the course of this litigation any of the challenged averments or an opinion that, if substantiated, the facts so established will bear asufficient connection to the issues in this case to be deemed relevant under Federal Rule of Evidence 401.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/2/16. (jfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abu-Jamal et al v. Kerestes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mumia Abu-Jamal
Represented By: Robert J. Boyle
Represented By: Bret D. Grote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Grote
Represented By: Robert J. Boyle
Represented By: Bret D. Grote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Boyle
Represented By: Robert J. Boyle
Represented By: Bret D. Grote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kerestes
Represented By: Laura J. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Medical Center
Represented By: Daniel T. Brier
Represented By: Suzanne Conaboy
Represented By: John B. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?