Mawson v. Desimone et al
Plaintiff: Robert William Mawson, Sr.
Defendant: Samual Desimone, Pittston City Police Department, Ferandis and 3rd Unknown Police Officer
Case Number: 3:2016cv00400
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Presiding Judge: Susan E. Schwab
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), The Report, (Doc. 191), is ADOPTED in part and NOT ADOPTED in part; Defendants motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 157), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part;The motion for summary judgme nt is DENIED with respect to the Fourth Amendment claim against Officer Fernandes based upon the February Stop, and this claim shall PROCEED to trial. Samual Desimone (Pittston City Police Officer) and Robert Powers terminated. (See order for details).Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/15/20. (bs)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)All claims against the Pittston Police Department are DISMISSED. The plaintiffs motions for leave to amend, (Docs. 86 & 89), are DENIED.8.The plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction, (Doc. 21), is DENIED.9.In all other respects, the motion to dismiss is DENIED.(See order for full details). ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab; Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/28/17. (bs)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)the Appeal, (Doc. 45), of the plaintiff Robert William Mawson, Sr.s of Magistrate Judge Susan Schwabs July 14, 2016 Order, is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/23/16. (bs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mawson v. Desimone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Mawson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samual Desimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittston City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferandis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3rd Unknown Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?