UGI Sunbury LLC v A Permanent Easement
Plaintiff: UGI Sunbury LLC
Defendant: A Permanent Easement, Donald D. Pontius, Georgia A. Pontius, Borough of Shamokin Dam, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania and All Unknown Owners
Case Number: 3:2016cv00794
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Snyder
Presiding Judge: Edwin M. Kosik
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Donald D. Pontius and Georgia A. Pontius, Co-Trustees of the Donald D. and Georgia A. Pontius Living Trust in the amount of $254,228.39; Clerk is also directed to release the bond posted by Plaintiff and to close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/31/2018. (jr)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to exclude 62 is denied; Defendant's motion to exclude 66 is denied; Defendant's motion to exclude 68 is denied; resolution of Defendant's motion to apply state law 64 is stayed. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/24/18. (lg)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 34 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Donald D. Pontius, Georgia A. Pontius. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/7/2016. (ch1)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (MEMORANDUM filed previously as separate docket entry) - Plaintiff's 17 MOTION for Hearing is DENIED. Plaintiff's 15 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall post a surety bond w/the Clerk of Court in the amount of $540,000.00 payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court" and sent to the U.S. Courthouse & Federal Bldg., Williamsport. The surety bond will be held in the vault located in the Clerk's Office - MDPA - Williamsport Division. (See Order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/2/16. (km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UGI Sunbury LLC v A Permanent Easement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UGI Sunbury LLC
Represented By: Paige F. Macdonald-Matthes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Permanent Easement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald D. Pontius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia A. Pontius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Shamokin Dam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?