UGI Sunbury LLC v A Permanent Easement
Plaintiff: |
UGI Sunbury LLC |
Defendant: |
A Permanent Easement, Dennis W. Beachel, Melissa K. Beachel, The Turbotville National Bank and All Unknown Owners |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00795 |
Filed: |
May 6, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Scranton Office |
County: |
Montour |
Presiding Judge: |
Edwin M. Kosik |
Nature of Suit: |
Land Condemnation |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 717 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 22, 2018 |
Filing
75
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion in limine (doc #49) is denied; Defendant's motion in limine (doc #45) is denied; Resolution of Defendant's motion in limine to use Pennsylvania Law (doc #47) is stayed pending the decision of the United States Court of Appeals. (see order for further/complete details) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/22/18. (lg)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
59
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 38 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Submit a Supplemental Expert's Report is GRANTED. Plaintiff MAY FILE a rebuttal to Defendants supple mental expert report by 2/16/2018. 44 Defendants' Motion to Stay, is DENIED. At the March 5, 2018 trial, the parties SHALL PRESENT evidence on just compensation for the land taken by Plaintiff, as that standard is defined under both federal and Pennsylvania law. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/26/2018. (jn)
|
August 2, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER (MEMORANDUM filed previously as separate docket entry) - Plaintiff's 14 MOTION for Hearing is DENIED. Plaintiff's 12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall post a surety bond w/the Clerk of Court in the amount of $8,706.00 payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court" and sent to the U.S. Courthouse & Federal Bldg., Williamsport. The surety bond will be held in the vault located in the Clerk's Office - MDPA - Williamsport Division. (See Order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/2/16. (km)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?