Sauers v. Borough of Nesquehoning et al
Plaintiff: Michael Sauers
Defendant: Borough of Nesquehoning, Chief of Police Sean Smith and Officer Stephen Homanko
Case Number: 3:2016cv00811
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Carbon
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) RE 51 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Borough of Nesquehoning. IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1) The motion is GRANTED with respect to Counts V (wrongful death), V I (survival action), and VII (respondeat superior/vicarious liability), and judgment is GRANTED to Defendant Borough of Nesquehoning on these counts; and 2) The motion is DENIED, without prejudice, with regard to the Borough of Nesquehonings duty to defend and indemnify Defendant Stephen Homanko. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 9/21/2020. (ve)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), GRANTING in part/DENYING in part 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM- Granted re Dft Sean Smith Counts I,V, VI; and Granted re pltf's punitive damages claim; denied in all other respects. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 3/3/17. (sm)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),DENYING 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Officer Stephen Homanko.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/14/17. (sm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauers v. Borough of Nesquehoning et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sauers
Represented By: Michael B Kaspszyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Nesquehoning
Represented By: Christopher P. Gerber
Represented By: Christine D. Steere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Sean Smith
Represented By: Christopher P. Gerber
Represented By: Christine D. Steere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stephen Homanko
Represented By: Joshua M. Autry
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?