"R.D" v. Shohola Camp Ground and Resort
Plaintiff: "R.D"
Defendant: Shohola Camp Ground and Resort
Case Number: 3:2016cv01056
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: James M. Munley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - In accordance with the accompanying memorandum, defense motions in limine Number 8, (Doc. 309 ), and Number 11 (Doc. 312 ) are DENIED without prejudice to the consideration of appropriate objections at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 20, 2019. (kjn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 319 MOTION in Limine #17 filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort, 317 MOTION in Limine #15 filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 19, 2019. (kjn)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 301 MOTION in Limine filed by "R.D". Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 15, 2019. (kjn)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting motions in limine 303 , 307 , 314 , 318 , 320 . All parties are instructed to tender proposed voir dire questions to the court on or before November 14, 2019, and these voir dire questions can be taken up at the pre-trial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 1, 2019. (kjn)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 272 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Late Submitted Records, any Reference to them or Treatment therein by any Witness, Plaintiff or Plaintiff's expert witnesses from NYPS filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 23, 2019. (kjn)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) OPINION re 253 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Roger K. Pitman, M.D. filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort, 203 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert, Roger Pitman, M.D. filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort, 174 DOCUMENT(S) PENDING SEALING DECISION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 13, 2019. (kjn)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: defendants motion to quash a subpoena to appear andtestify at a deposition issued by the plaintiff to Gary Trobe, an investigator for the defendant. (Doc. 136.). IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff may conduct an oral deposition of Gary Trobe on the narrow issue of whether Trobe attempted to intimidate or influence the testimony of non-party witness E.J. at the U.S. Courthouse, Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, at a date and time to be approved by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 10, 2019. (kjn)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 233 MOTION for Reconsideration re 231 Order, Terminate Motions, 230 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) of the part of the Order denying Shohola, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Direct Negligence C filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 4/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 12, 2019. (kjn)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 204 MOTION to Strike plaintiff's expert, Hal Pugach filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 14, 2018. (kjn)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 202 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 13, 2018. (kjn)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM ORDER - For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, we agree that further disclosure of the investigative interview of E.J. in its entirety is not necessary simply because it was provided to Dr. Pittman given the undisputed f act that the transcript played no role in the doctors testimony, and the request for disclosure of this interview in its entirety is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dispositive motions deadline in thiscase is VACATED and the parties are ORDER ED to notify us once the interlocutory appeal has concluded so that a revised case management schedule can be set following the resolution of this interlocutory appeal. Of course, this order is entered without prejudice to any party filing any potentially dispositive motions at any time as the litigation progresses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 24, 2018. (kjn)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)AFFRIMING the Order of Magistrate Judge CarlsonSigned by Honorable James M. Munley on 4/24/18. (sm)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: 136 MOTION to Quash - IT IS ORDERED that the motionto quash the subpoena served upon Gary Trobe, (Doc. 136), is DENIED. The pltf may depose Trobe on the narrow issue of whether Trobe attempted tointimidate or influence the t estimony of non-party witnesses E.J., G.M., andMassachusetts State Police Detective Matthew Cosgrove. This order is enteredwithout prejudice to the dfts ability to file a later motion in limine after the close of discovery in the event that the defen dant believes that the pltfsquestioning of Trobe impermissibly delves into opinion work product, or isotherwise inadmissible. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if the parties anticipate any substantive disputes regarding the proper scope of this deposition , the deposition of Trobe shall take place at the U.S. Courthouse, 228 Walnut Street,Harrisburg, PA. The parties are instructed to contact Courtroom Deputy Kevin Neary to arrange a date and time to conduct the deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 6, 2017. (kjn)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no further disclosure of the submitted e-mails is necessary in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 24, 2017. (kjn)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Dr. Cohen shall be reimbursed for his deposition testimony at the statutory rate of $40 per day, but IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this directive is entered without prejudice to Dr. Cohen and his counsel coming back before this court, upon completion of the deposition, and seeking a reasonable rate of reimbursement authorized Rule 26(b)(4)(E) for expert witnesses if the deposition reveals that that expert testimony is elicited from the doctor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 10, 2017. (kjn)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM ORDER - addressing numerous discovery disputes, setting deadlines for in camera review, submission of a privilege log, and directing the submission of a status report on 5/12/2017. SEE MEMO AND ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 1, 2017. (kjn)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: 70 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce the Entire Video of E.J. filed by Shohola Camp Ground and Resort. The defendants motion to compel disclosure of the interview of E.J. is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 30, 2017. (kjn)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Tthe plaintiffs request to have an observer attend the Rule 35 examination of the plaintiff is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 17, 2017. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: "R.D" v. Shohola Camp Ground and Resort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: "R.D"
Represented By: Michael B. Leh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shohola Camp Ground and Resort
Represented By: Glen Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?