Audi of America, Inc. v. Bronsberg & Hughes Pontiac, Inc.
Plaintiff: Audi of America, Inc.
Defendant: Bronsberg & Hughes Pontiac, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv02470
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Luzerne
Presiding Judge: John E. Jones
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 (Redacted)MEMORANDUM and Order dated February 16, 2018 (eo)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Accordingly, the Court having found that the 21 documents set forth on Audis privilege log are subject either to the attorney-client or work-product privilege, the defendants-intervenors request to compel further production of these documents is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 16, 2018. (kjn)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court having found that the 54 documents set forth on Wyoming Valleys privilege log are subject either to the common-interest privilege or are otherwise protected by the attorney-client privilege, Audis motion to compel further production of these documents is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 8, 2017. (kjn)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 136 MOTION to Quash Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Subpoenas filed by North American Automotive Services, Inc., Napleton Automotive of Urbana, LLC, Napleton Orlando Imports, LLC, Napleton Sanford Imports, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 17, 2017. (kjn)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM ORDER ORDER - 1. Napletons Motion to Permissively Intervene (Doc. 52 .) is GRANTED. 2. Napletons request to dissolve the preliminary injunction (Doc. 52 .) is DEEMED MOOT. 3. With respect to Audis contempt show-cause motion, (Doc. 65 .), we DECLINE to certify a contempt at this time. 4. The motions to quash the subpoenas issued in connection with this show- cause motion, (Doc. 101 and 108 .), are DISMISSED without prejudice to renewal. 5. The motions for extension of time in which to indulge in further briefing of this show-cause motion, are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 16, 2017. (kjn)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 106 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Testify at a Hearing filed by William Hughes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 25, 2017. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Audi of America, Inc. v. Bronsberg & Hughes Pontiac, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audi of America, Inc.
Represented By: Tucker R. Hull
Represented By: Randall L Oyler
Represented By: Brandon C Prosansky
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Owen H Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronsberg & Hughes Pontiac, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis George
Represented By: Nicholas D George
Represented By: Jeffrey Scafaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?