JELLEY et al v. COLTON AUTO, INC.
Plaintiff: BRENDA JELLEY and JOSEPH F. SALCE
Defendant: COLTON AUTO, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00211
Filed: January 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order approving re #32 Stipulation of Dismissal. Case dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 11/6/19. (ms)
November 5, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Dismissal by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE, filed by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE.(Jamiolkowski, Alexander)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery due by 10/3/2019. Plaintiff expert reports due 11/4/19; defendant retained experts due 12/3/19; supplementations due 12/23/19. Motions due by 1/2/2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/30/19 (ms)
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by COLTON AUTO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Maureen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery due by 5/3/2019. Plaintiff expert reports due 6/3/19; defendant expert reports due 7/3/19; supplementations due 7/23/19. Motions due by 8/2/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/13/19 (ms)
February 11, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jamiolkowski, Alexander)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery due by 3/4/2019. Plaintiff expert reports due 4/4/19; defendant rexpert reports due 5/6/19; supplementations due 5/27/19. Motions due by 5/20/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/11/18 (ms)
October 10, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jamiolkowski, Alexander)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2018. Discovery due by 11/2/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 8/3/2018. Motions due by 3/4/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/4/18. (ms)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Conference to be initiated by the Court. Attached scheduling order to be completed and provided to Court 3 business days prior to conference.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/23/18. (ms)
May 22, 2018 Filing 22 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/24/16 is cancelled. Case assigned to MJ Saporito.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/22/18. (jam)
May 22, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION CONSENT TO EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE. (Jamiolkowski, Alexander)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 5/24/2018 11:15 AM. The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiiffs. See Order for additional details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/29/18. (jam)
February 12, 2018 Filing 19 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/12/18. (jam)
February 2, 2018 Filing 18 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Cheryl Esposito Kaufman terminated on behalf of Colton Auto, Inc.. (Jordan, Maureen)
February 2, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen A. Jordan on behalf of COLTON AUTO, INC. (Jordan, Maureen)
January 31, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:17-cv-01221 containing 1-15 electronic documents and docket sheet received. (lh)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting #11 Motion to Change Venue. This action hereby is transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania forthwith. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case as CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 1/29/18. (kld) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition re #11 Motion to Change Venue filed by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE. (Jamiolkowski, Alexander) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #11 Motion to Change Venue. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a Brief in Opposition on or before 12/15/2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines set in the #10 Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order are STAYED and the Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2017 is CANCELLED pending resolution of the #11 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/4/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support re #11 Motion to Change Venue filed by COLTON AUTO, INC.. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
December 1, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue by COLTON AUTO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Room 10160 before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/21/2017. Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, and Confidential Position Letters due by 12/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/6/2017. (sms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER vacating #6 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference before Judge Cathy Bissoon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/6/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Joint Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/6/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 7 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE. (Jamiolkowski, Alexander) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/27/17. (jhi) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by COLTON AUTO, INC.. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COLTON AUTO, INC.. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
October 19, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 10/26/2017. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Esposito Kaufman on behalf of COLTON AUTO, INC.. (Kaufman, Cheryl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/19/17. (dcd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
September 19, 2017 Summons Issued as to COLTON AUTO, INC. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COLTON AUTO, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4464752), filed by BRENDA JELLEY, JOSEPH F. SALCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JELLEY et al v. COLTON AUTO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA JELLEY
Represented By: Alexander J Jamiolkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. SALCE
Represented By: Alexander J Jamiolkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLTON AUTO, INC.
Represented By: Cheryl Esposito Kaufman
Represented By: Maureen A. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?