MARTINEZ v. BROOKMONT HEALTH CARE CTR.
Plaintiff: Guaironex Martinez
Defendant: Brookmont Health Care CTR.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01557
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Referring Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (ao)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (ao)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from Eastern District of Pennsylvania; Case Number 2:18-cv-03255. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA. THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 8/2/18. 8/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BROOKMONT HEALTH CARE CTR., filed by GUAIRONEX MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by GUAIRONEX MARTINEZ..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ v. BROOKMONT HEALTH CARE CTR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookmont Health Care CTR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guaironex Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?