The United States Of America v. Dorshimer et al

Plaintiff: The United States Of America
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Sharon F. dorshimer, Deceased, Gary Dorshimer and Jeremy Dorshimer
Case Number: 3:2018cv01566
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Scranton Office
County: Carbon
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1471
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by The United States Of America. (Solarz, Rebecca)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing pltf to file status report re service w/i 10 days of this order.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/24/18. (sm)
August 9, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Munley (jw)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States Of America v. Dorshimer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States Of America
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Solarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs of Sharon F. dorshimer, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Dorshimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Dorshimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?