Whited v. The New Cafe' at Greystone Gardens et al

Plaintiff: Kathleen Whited
Defendant: The New Cafe' at Greystone Gardens and Dominic Saadi
Undetermined: Mediator
Case Number: 3:2018cv01811
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Joseph Anthony Barrett for Mediator added.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/7/18. (bs)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2019. Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2019. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 1/31/2019. Defendant Expert Report is due by 3/1/2019. Supplemental due by 4/1/2019. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 6/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/5/18. (bs)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kathleen Whited. (Pollick, Cynthia)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference CONTINUED UNTIL 11/5/2018 01:30 PM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/26/18. (bs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Cynthia L Pollick RE: JCM scheduling conflict. (Pollick, Cynthia)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2018 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/21/18. (bs)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Dominic Saadi, The New Cafe' at Greystone Gardens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Complaint)(O'Brien, Joseph)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/17/18. (bs)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dominic Saadi, The New Cafe' at Greystone Gardens from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 2018-CV-4535. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4542969), filed by Dominic Saadi, The New Cafe' at Greystone Gardens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whited v. The New Cafe' at Greystone Gardens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New Cafe' at Greystone Gardens
Represented By: Jenna M. Kraycer
Represented By: Joseph A. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Saadi
Represented By: Jenna M. Kraycer
Represented By: Joseph A. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Whited
Represented By: Cynthia L. Pollick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Mediator
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?