Knapp v. Consulate Health Care

Plaintiff: Wilma Knapp
Defendant: Consulate Health Care
Case Number: 3:2018cv01941
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilma Knapp. Consulate Health Care served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Gottesfeld, Mark)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Dkt. 1] filed by Consulate Health Care.(Barnes, Adam)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Dkt. 1] by Consulate Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Adam)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Mark Gottesfeld, Esq. pursuant to the Court's October 15, 2018 Order informing the Court that service has been effected. (Gottesfeld, Mark)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Barnes on behalf of Consulate Health Care (Barnes, Adam)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/15/18. (jam)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Consulate Health Care and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
October 8, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Mariani (jw)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Consulate Health Care ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4564580), filed by Wilma Knapp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. Consulate Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulate Health Care
Represented By: Adam Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Knapp
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Represented By: R. Andrew Santillo
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?