Pledger v. Columbia Associates Management, LP et al

Plaintiff: Britt Pledger
Defendant: Columbia Associates Management Company, LLC, Columbia Associates Management, LP and Columbia Associates Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01945
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David N. Korsen on behalf of Britt Pledger (Korsen, David)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Britt Pledger. Columbia Associates Management Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2018, answer due 12/10/2018; Columbia Associates Management, Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2018, answer due 12/10/2018; Columbia Associates Management, LP waiver sent on 10/9/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Karpf, Ari)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Fecile-Moreland on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fecile-Moreland, Patricia)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 10/18/18. (sm)
October 9, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Munley (jw)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Columbia Associates Management Company, LLC, Columbia Associates Management, Inc., Columbia Associates Management, LP and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Columbia Associates Management Company, LLC, Columbia Associates Management, Inc., Columbia Associates Management, LP ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4565258), filed by Britt Pledger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pledger v. Columbia Associates Management, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Associates Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Patricia Fecile-Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Associates Management, LP
Represented By: Patricia Fecile-Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Associates Management, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Fecile-Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt Pledger
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: David N. Korsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?