Cruz et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Villablanca and Odette Cruz
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01971
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 7 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiffs' Complaint Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Lorenz, Michael)
October 29, 2018 6 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Odette Cruz, Daniel Villablanca. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service)(Riegel, Brett)
October 19, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal with State Court by Michael K. Lorenz on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Lorenz, Michael)
October 18, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Memo Memorandum of Law, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lorenz, Michael)
October 12, 2018 2 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/12/18. (jam)
October 11, 2018 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (lh)
October 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4568415), filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Removal of Adversary)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K. Lorenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K. Lorenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Villablanca
Represented By: Brett J. Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odette Cruz
Represented By: Brett J. Riegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?