Hazzouri et al v. West Pittston Borough

Plaintiff: Richard Hazzouri and Kimberly Hazzouri
Defendant: West Pittston Borough
Case Number: 3:2018cv01982
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 13 CERTIFICATE of by Richard Hazzouri of Service. (Lombardo, Michael)
December 4, 2018 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Kimberly Hazzouri, Richard Hazzouri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order, #2 Appendix Appendix A)(Anderson, Lars)
December 4, 2018 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Kimberly Hazzouri, Richard Hazzouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Anderson, Lars)
December 4, 2018 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Kimberly Hazzouri, Richard Hazzouri. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s) Appendix A, #2 Appendix)(Anderson, Lars)
November 26, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lars Henry Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Anderson, Lars)
November 26, 2018 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by West Pittston Borough.(Heisler, David)
November 26, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by West Pittston Borough. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Heisler, David)
November 21, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against West Pittston Borough, filed by Richard Hazzouri, Kimberly Hazzouri.(Anderson, Lars)
November 9, 2018 5 Letter from Atty Joseph A Quinn Jr -re: in lieu of a a responsive brief ; they will file an Amended Complaint (cl)
November 2, 2018 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by West Pittston Borough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Local Rule 7.8(b)(2) Certification)(Heisler, David)
October 19, 2018 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by West Pittston Borough. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Heisler, David)
October 18, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 10/18/18. (sm)
October 15, 2018 Receipt of payment from CIPRIANI WERNER PC in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 10/12/2018. Receipt number 333062686 processed by lhannick. (jjs, )
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Pittston Borough from Luzerne County, case number 2018-10872. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 333062686), filed by West Pittston Borough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazzouri et al v. West Pittston Borough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Pittston Borough
Represented By: David E. Heisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hazzouri
Represented By: Michelle M. Quinn
Represented By: Joseph A. Quinn, Jr.
Represented By: Lars Henry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hazzouri
Represented By: Michelle M. Quinn
Represented By: Joseph A. Quinn, Jr.
Represented By: Lars Henry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?