AT&T Corp. v. Quadix LLC

Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Defendant: Quadix LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01984
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Quadix LLC.(Katsock, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AT&T Corp.. Quadix LLC served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Macdonald-Matthes, Paige)
October 26, 2018 4 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/25/18. (jam)
October 25, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Mariani (ao)
October 23, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige F. Macdonald-Matthes on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Macdonald-Matthes, Paige)
October 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Judge Caputo has been assigned to this case. (ga)
October 12, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Quadix LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (bg)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Quadix LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4570159), filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Corp. v. Quadix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pratt
Represented By: Paige F. Macdonald-Matthes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quadix LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Katsock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?