Yatsko v. Adams and Associates, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linda A. Yatskio and Linda A. Yatsko
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc., Adams and Associates, Inc., Admas Associates, Inc., Keystone Job Corps Center High School and Adams Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02068
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adams & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Curci, Christopher)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda A. Yatsko. All Defendants. (Borland, Kimberly)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Ward on behalf of Adams & Associates, Inc. (Ward, Jennifer)
November 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M Curci on behalf of Adams and Associates, Inc. (Curci, Christopher)
November 23, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Adams and Associates, Inc.. Adams and Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Curci, Christopher)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Service Status Report by Linda A. Yatsko. (Borland, Kimberly)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/25/18. (jam)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 CORRECTED Summons Issued as to Adams & Associates, Inc., Adams and Associates, Inc., Admas Associates, Inc., Keystone Job Corps Center High School and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao) Modified on 10/25/2018 (ao).
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adams & Associates, Inc., Adams and Associates, Inc., Admas Associates, Inc., Keystone Job Corps Center High School and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adams & Associates, Inc., Adams and Associates, Inc., Admas Associates, Inc., Keystone Job Corps Center High School ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4580461), filed by Linda A. Yatsko. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yatsko v. Adams and Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Curci
Represented By: Jennifer L. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Curci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admas Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Job Corps Center High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A. Yatskio
Represented By: Kimberly D. Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A. Yatsko
Represented By: Kimberly D. Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?