Patrick-Perez v. Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Turique Patrick-Perez
Defendant: Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office and Lackawanna County
Case Number: 3:2018cv02202
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Lackawanna County, Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office. Lackawanna County waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Carmody, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew John Carmody on behalf of Lackawanna County, Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office. (Carmody, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina M Blewitt on behalf of Lackawanna County, Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office. (Blewitt, Regina)
November 16, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan N Fitzgerald on behalf of Lackawanna County, Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office. (Fitzgerald, Brendan)
November 16, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Menichini on behalf of Lackawanna County, Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office. (Menichini, Jennifer)
November 16, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Joyce, III on behalf of Lackawanna County, Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office. (Joyce, Joseph)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/14/18. (bs)
November 14, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Lackawanna County, Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh)
November 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4598220), filed by Turique Patrick-Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick-Perez v. Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lackawanna County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Regina M Blewitt
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce, III
Represented By: Brendan N Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jennifer Menichini
Represented By: Matthew John Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lackawanna County
Represented By: Regina M Blewitt
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce, III
Represented By: Brendan N Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jennifer Menichini
Represented By: Matthew John Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turique Patrick-Perez
Represented By: Kimberly D. Borland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?