KOLLER et al v. ZALE DELAWARE, INC.

Plaintiff: Dena Koller and Henry Koller
Defendant: Zale Delaware, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02333
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: A Richard Caputo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dena Koller, Henry Koller. Zale Delaware, Inc. waiver sent on 12/28/2018, answer due 2/26/2019. (Schwartz, Joseph)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Nicolosi, Jr on behalf of Zale Delaware, Inc., Zale Delaware, Inc.. (Nicolosi, Benjamin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Zale Delaware, Inc., Zale Delaware, Inc.. (Kent, Douglas)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Kent on behalf of All Defendants (Kent, Douglas)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Tucci, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Tucci, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-05035. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER-MEMORANDUM THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/30/18. 12/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2018.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DENA KOLLER. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2018.]
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT DENA AND HENRY KOLLER SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING TEN PAGES FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/29/18 AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT TRANSFER THIS CASE UNDER 28 U.S.C. &&1404,1406 TO THE USDC FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA OR ANOTHER DISTRICT WITH SOME CONNECTION TO THIS DISPUTE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/21/18. 11/21/18 ENTERED AND MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2018.]
November 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DENA KOLLER, HENRY KOLLER. (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to ZALE DELAWARE, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/21/18 (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZALE DELAWARE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 188203.), filed by DENA KOLLER, HENRY KOLLER.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOLLER et al v. ZALE DELAWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Koller
Represented By: Joseph F. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Koller
Represented By: Joseph F. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zale Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Tucci, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas J. Kent
Represented By: Benjamin A. Nicolosi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?