Azzam v. Liberty Mutual Group Inc.

Plaintiff: Hesham Azzam
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02340
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lily Koohday Huffman on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group Inc. (Huffman, Lily)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A. Carlos on behalf of Liberty Mutual Group Inc. (Carlos, Pamela)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Hesham Azzam. Liberty Mutual Group Inc. waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Weisberg, Matthew)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Liberty Mutual Group Inc on 12/27/18, filed by Hesham Azzam. (Schafkopf, Gary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/11/18. (jam)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Group Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Group Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4618618), filed by Hesham Azzam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azzam v. Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Represented By: Pamela A. Carlos
Represented By: Lily Koohday Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hesham Azzam
Represented By: Gary Schafkopf
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?