Sposto v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Joyce Sposto
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv02382
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: James M Munley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2019 10:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/6/19. (sm)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/6/19. (sm)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff, Joyce Sposto by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Malyk, Jaclyn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION EXTENDING THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE MOVE BY JANUARY 23, 2019 by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, AMENDED CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE. (Malyk, Jaclyn)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 12/17/18. (sm)
December 17, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Munley (jw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Prudential Insurance Company of America from Lackawanna County, case number 18vcv5908. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4625895), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 C of S)(bg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sposto v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jaclyn DiLascio Malyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Sposto
Represented By: Edwin A. Abrahamsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?