Rhine v. Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Charles Rhine
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 3:2018cv02459
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated.Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/14/19. (jam)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement Ltr RE Case Settled by Charles Rhine (Fiorillo, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons Proof of Service served on Liberty Mutual on January 7, 2019, filed by Charles Rhine. (Fiorillo, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order accepting #4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall have until 2/15/19 to file and serve a written response to Plaintif's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/15/19. (jam)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston.. (Silver, Steven)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston. (Silver, Steven)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/2/19. (jam)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4635077), filed by Charles Rhine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhine v. Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Steven Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rhine
Represented By: Michael J. Fiorillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?