Boylan v. New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Cindy Boylan
Defendant: New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group
Case Number: 3:2019cv00038
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Referring Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 2/28/2019. (cw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved. Judge Mehalchick assigned.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/27/19. (bs)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group (Diamond, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The Court has reviewed the Joint Case Management Plan submitted on February 14, 2019. (Doc. 70). Within the plan, the parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. Therefore the Case Management Conference scheduled for February 21, 2019 is CANCELLED. The Clerk is directed to send the appropriate consent form to counsel. The consent form shall be completed and filed with the court on or before February 28, 2019. Upon receipt the case will be reassigned to a United States Magistrate Judge who will reschedule the case management conference.re #7 Case Management Plan filed by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(bs)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint case management plan by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group. (Diamond, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2019 11:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/22/19. (bs)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Petition for Removal by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group.(Diamond, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group. (Diamond, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/8/19. (bs)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group re #1 Notice of Removal,. (ao)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group from Court of Common Pleas of Monroe County, case number 8989-CV-2017. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4640796), filed by New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boylan v. New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Boylan
Represented By: Salvatore P.J. Vito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Manufacturers Insurance Company and/or NJM Insurance Group
Represented By: Michael J. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?